Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 19:52:34 (UTC).

WILLIAM WU VS LESLEY CONCEPCION CIAU CHAN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 WILLIAM WU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LESLEY CONCEPCION CIAU CHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4085

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WU WILLIAM

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

CHAN LESLY CONCEPCION CIAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRIEF GARRETT M.

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/25/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/20/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/9/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/3/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

12/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/28/2019: Unknown

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

3/8/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/16/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) of 01/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by William Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC644085    Hearing Date: December 07, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

WILLIAM WU,

Plaintiff,

vs.

LESLEY CONCEPCION CIAU CHAN.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: BC644085

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

OSC: December 7, 2020

)

On December 16, 2016, plaintiff William Wu (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Lesley Concepcion Ciau Chan (“Defendant”) for damages arising out of an automobile accident.

Plaintiff originally sought a default judgment in the amount of $11,749.72 consisting of $6,120.41 in special damages, $5,000 in general damages, and $629.31 in costs. The court previously considered these requests.

Per the court’s April 7, 2020 minute order, the court found that the evidence submitted by Plaintiff supported a reduced judgment in the amount of $10,451.92: (a) $4,822.61 in special damages, (b) $5,000.00 in general damages, and (c) $629.31 in costs. If Plaintiff found this reduced amount acceptable, Plaintiff was to submit a revised proposed judgment on JUD-100 reflecting the amounts stated above.

On July 6, 2020, Plaintiff submitted a revised proposed judgment on JUD-100 reflecting a judgment in the amount of $10,451.92.

The court grants Plaintiff’s application for default judgment in the amount of $10,451.92.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court’s website at www.lacourt.org.

Dated this 7th day of December 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton

Judge of the Superior Court