This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 09:42:51 (UTC).

WILLIAM P BARRETTA VS JEFFREY T SANTORO

Case Summary

On 09/07/2010 WILLIAM P BARRETTA filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JEFFREY T SANTORO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERNEST HIROSHIGE, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5070

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRETTA WILLIAM P.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SANTORO JEFFREY T.

Not Classified By Court

VINCENT CAROLINE C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREEDMAN BRYAN J. ESQ.

ANDREWS WILLIAM M.

Defendant Attorney

CROCKETT WILLIAM E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF WILLIAM P. BARRETTAS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; (2) BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; (3) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (4) CONVERSION; (5

3/25/2011: PLAINTIFF WILLIAM P. BARRETTAS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; (2) BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; (3) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (4) CONVERSION; (5

Minute Order -

4/25/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

7/8/2011: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AS TRUE, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR1TIES; DECLARATION OF KENNETH C. BOUNDS

8/10/2011: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AS TRUE, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR1TIES; DECLARATION OF KENNETH C. BOUNDS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/12/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/2/2012: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM P. BARRETTA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED DEFENDANT?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC.

3/19/2012: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM P. BARRETTA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED DEFENDANT?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC.

DECLARATION OF STEVEN B. STIGLITZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED DEFENDANT?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC.

3/19/2012: DECLARATION OF STEVEN B. STIGLITZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED DEFENDANT?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC.

Minute Order -

3/20/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CHANCE OF HEARING

3/27/2012: NOTICE OF CHANCE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND TO FORM INTERROGATORY 15.1 ETC

5/1/2012: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND TO FORM INTERROGATORY 15.1 ETC

RULING

5/1/2012: RULING

NOTICE OF RULING

5/25/2012: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

8/10/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

8/14/2012: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/21/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

9/17/2012: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Proof of Service -

9/19/2012: Proof of Service -

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Jeffrey T. Santoro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketRULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jeffrey T. Santoro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • DocketDEFENDANT JEFFREY T. SANTOROS NOTICE OF DEMURRER, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Jeffrey T. Santoro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFF WILLIAM P. BARRETTAS COMPLAINT FOR: (D BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William P. Barretta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less