This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2015 at 23:02:09 (UTC).

WILLIAM MENDOZA VS AMCORD INC

Case Summary

On 06/11/2009 WILLIAM MENDOZA filed an Other lawsuit against AMCORD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3223

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES R. DUNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA WILLIAM

Defendants

AMCORD INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL INC.

CALIFORNIA PARTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY COMPANY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

HAMILTON MATERIALS INC.

HANSON AGGREGATES WEST INC.

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT INC.

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

JOHN K. BICE COMPANY INC.

KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

LA HABRA PRODUCTS INC.

MACARTHUR COMPANY

MISSION STUCCO COMPANY

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONADIO DAVID R. ESQ.

GLASER JANETTE H.

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS BARBARA R. ESQ.

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

BLACKARD EUGENE C. JR. ESQ.

BLOMQUIST SONJA E. ESQ.

BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

BUTY MADELINE L. ESQ.

COSGROVE PHILIP R. ESQ.

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

IMAI TADLOCK KEENEY & CORDERY LLP

KANNETT MARK S. ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD BARNES

SAYERS WILLIAM J.

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/11/2009: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

6/12/2009: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

6/12/2009: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MINUTE ORDER

10/30/2009: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICF OF RULING

9/27/2010: NOTICF OF RULING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, BY DEFENDANT WESTON BUILDERS SUPPLY COMPANY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

9/30/2010: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, BY DEFENDANT WESTON BUILDERS SUPPLY COMPANY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

NOTICE RE: ADVANCE OF HEARING

10/5/2010: NOTICE RE: ADVANCE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT UNION CARBII)E CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LMUNE NO.3 TO PRFCLUIW EVIDENCE REGARDING UNION CARBIDES CORPORATE STRUCTURE OR ITS RFLAT1ONSHIP TO THE DOW CHEMICAL. COMPANY; I)ECLARATION OF MARY T. M

12/16/2010: DEFENDANT UNION CARBII)E CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LMUNE NO.3 TO PRFCLUIW EVIDENCE REGARDING UNION CARBIDES CORPORATE STRUCTURE OR ITS RFLAT1ONSHIP TO THE DOW CHEMICAL. COMPANY; I)ECLARATION OF MARY T. M

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.27 DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS MOTION IN [AMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF NUMBER OF ASBESTOS FIBERS IN A BAG OF COLTON GUN PLASTIC CEMENT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT LI. BERKES

12/21/2010: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.27 DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS MOTION IN [AMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF NUMBER OF ASBESTOS FIBERS IN A BAG OF COLTON GUN PLASTIC CEMENT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT LI. BERKES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

12/22/2010: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS (FIA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY) WITNESS LIST

12/30/2010: DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS (FIA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY) WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC.S WITNESS LIST

1/7/2011: DEFENDANT FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC.S WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS PROPOSFD JURY INSTRUCTIONS

1/7/2011: DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS PROPOSFD JURY INSTRUCTIONS

[PROPOSED1 JURY INSTRUCTIONS

1/7/2011: [PROPOSED1 JURY INSTRUCTIONS

AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST OF DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC.

3/4/2011: AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST OF DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE

7/21/2011: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE

Minute Order

8/15/2011: Minute Order

243 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (compliant as to Amcord Inc., ONLY each side to bear its own costs ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT as to defendnat Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc and Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. formerly known as Kaiser Cement Corporation ONLY each party to bear its ow costs) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • Reply/Response (to osc ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • Response (to ntc of OSC re dismissal ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • Reply/Response (to ntc of osc re dismissal ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2009
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • Notice of Incoming Case Transfer Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Request for Dismissal (AS TO CALPORTLAND COMPANY F/K/A CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Papers and Documents on Transfer Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less