This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 12:31:02 (UTC).

WILLIAM M. JACKSON VS. GWENDOLYN JACKSON-CRAWFORD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2013 WILLIAM M JACKSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GWENDOLYN JACKSON-CRAWFORD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7432

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Defendants

JACKSON-OSIN ADRIAN

JACKSON JONES YUNDLANDER

JACKSON MICHAEL

JACKSON RONNIE L.

JACKSON ALICIA

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

JACKSON-CRAWFORD GWENDOLYN

Trustee

JACKSON WILLIAM M. SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM BOON ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF ALVIN B. SHERRON

Other Attorneys

RICHARDSON DOUGLAS T. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2014
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Opposition (TO PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Opposition (TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Petition (FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Motion to Strike (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL & CONTI- NUANCE ) Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT FOR QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AT 11802 ROBIN STREET, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90059 PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Statement of Decision filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR CANCELLATION OF GRANT DEED AND TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (EMAIL DATED 2/27/14 FROM DEFENDANT "LISA" JACKSON (AKA ALICIA JACKSON) ADDRESSED TO JUDGE WILLIAM BARRY ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less