This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:16:24 (UTC).

WILLIAM M ANDREWS VS T D SERVICE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2011 WILLIAM M ANDREWS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against T D SERVICE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, RALPH W. DAU and ROBERT H. O'BRIEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9514

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

RALPH W. DAU

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREWS WILLIAM M.

Defendants

CITIMORTGAGE INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

T.D. SERVICE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREWS WILLIAM M.

Defendant Attorneys

SIMONIAN VICKEN I. ESQ.

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

LAWRENCE J. DREYFUSS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF WIL.JLIATC{ M. ANDREWS COMPLAINT FOR 1NJUNCI1VE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF: VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 2923.5, 2924 (A)(B)(C); 3422; (FAILURE TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND ADEQUATE NOTICE OF SA

9/13/2011: PLAINTIFF WIL.JLIATC{ M. ANDREWS COMPLAINT FOR 1NJUNCI1VE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF: VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 2923.5, 2924 (A)(B)(C); 3422; (FAILURE TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND ADEQUATE NOTICE OF SA

TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY FNJUNCTION

9/13/2011: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY FNJUNCTION

SUMMONS -

9/13/2011: SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

9/27/2011: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF PATRICIA A. RANDALL N OPPOSITION TO OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/27/2011: DECLARATION OF PATRICIA A. RANDALL N OPPOSITION TO OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order -

9/29/2011: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS BY T.D, SERVICE COMPANY (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 29241)

10/14/2011: DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS BY T.D, SERVICE COMPANY (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 29241)

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/14/2011: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (LIS PENDENS)

11/4/2011: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (LIS PENDENS)

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER

12/1/2011: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER

Minute Order -

12/8/2011: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/4/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

1/18/2012: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/18/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order -

1/25/2012: Minute Order -

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITIMORTGAGE, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

1/25/2012: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITIMORTGAGE, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

1/27/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

NO?[ICE OF RLJLINC RE: DFFENI)ANT CITI MORT(;A(;E, INC.?S X PMT[E AII?IJCA?J?ION 10 I)ISMISS ILAINTIFF?S CONII?LAINT

1/30/2012: NO?[ICE OF RLJLINC RE: DFFENI)ANT CITI MORT(;A(;E, INC.?S X PMT[E AII?IJCA?J?ION 10 I)ISMISS ILAINTIFF?S CONII?LAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketNO[ICE OF RLJLINC RE: DFFENI)ANT CITI MORT(;A(;E, INC.S X PMT[E AIIIJCAJION 10 I)ISMISS ILAINTIFFS CONIILAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITIMORTGAGE, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketAttorney Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 86; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY FNJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAIN INC ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM M. ANDREWS; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFF WIL.JLIATC{ M. ANDREWS COMPLAINT FOR 1NJUNCI1VE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF: VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 2923.5, 2924 (A)(B)(C); 3422; (FAILURE TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND ADEQUATE NOTICE OF SALE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketEx-parte Request for Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less