This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 14:40:18 (UTC).

WILLIAM JAMES SILBERMANN VS KLEWIN CONSTRUCTION, INC.,

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 WILLIAM JAMES SILBERMANN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KLEWIN CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1000

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BILL SIBERMANN CONSTRUCTION

SIBERMANN WILLIAM JAMES

ROES 1-100

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-20

KLEWIN CONSTRUCTION INC.

RUBICON B.HACIENDA LLC

DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PICOZZI ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN

JACK WILLIAM FLEMING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BILL SIBERMANN CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party); WILLIAM JAMES SIBERMANN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Cross-complaint filed; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by RUBICON B.HACIENDA, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Answer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by RUBICON B.HACIENDA, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Answer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Ex Parte Motion (TO CONT TRIAL DATE) - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • Notice (OF ACTION PENDING (LIS PENDENS) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PTY SERVED: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND PERSONS ERVED: BECKY DEGEORGE, PERSON AUTH TO ACCEPT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by BILL SIBERMANN CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party); WILLIAM JAMES SIBERMANN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Summons; Filed by BILL SIBERMANN CONSTRUCTION (Legacy Party); WILLIAM JAMES SIBERMANN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.