This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 01:28:04 (UTC).

WILLIAM HART VS ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2013 WILLIAM HART filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5681

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HART WILLIAM

Defendants and Respondents

ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

ANDERSON ROWE & BUCKLEY INC.

ANHEUSER-BUSCH LLC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

ATLAS HEATING & VENTILATING CO.

BD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

C & H SUGAR COMPANY INC.

CAHILL CONTRACTORS INC.

CALIFORNIA AND HAWAIIAN SUGAR COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

CITY OF BURBANK

CITY OF PASADENA

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLER FISHBACK & JACKSON LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

AMELIA ANN ALBANO CITY ATTORNEY

ANDREWS KURTH LLP

ARCHER NORRIS

ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES LLP

BECHERER KANNETT SCHWEITZER

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

BINGHAM MCCUTCHEN LLP [CA]

BINGHAM MCCUTCHEN LLP [WASH DC]

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

HAKE LAW A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

IMAI TADLOCK KEENEY & CORDERY LLP

JACKSON JENKINS RENSTROM LLP

K&L GATES LLP

LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES W JENKINS

LOMBARDI LOPER & CONANT LLP

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY NEGLIGENCE STRICT LIABILITY FALSE REPRESENTATION INTENTIONAL TORT PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE ? CLUTCH & BRAKE COMPONENTS STRICT LIABILITY - CLUTCH & B

7/18/2013: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY NEGLIGENCE STRICT LIABILITY FALSE REPRESENTATION INTENTIONAL TORT PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE ? CLUTCH & BRAKE COMPONENTS STRICT LIABILITY - CLUTCH & B

SUMMONS -

7/18/2013: SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT SPRECKELS SUGAR COMPANY, INC.?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. AND GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL SETTING ORDER FUNCTIONALLY PRECLUDING FILI

10/18/2013: DEFENDANT SPRECKELS SUGAR COMPANY, INC.?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. AND GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL SETTING ORDER FUNCTIONALLY PRECLUDING FILI

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/22/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTING

11/14/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY, INC.

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY, INC.

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

11/18/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (REJECTED) AS TO DEFT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL REJECTED; AS TO UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION; NTC OF REJECTION ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL COA

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY NEGLIGENCE STRICT LIABILITY FALSE REPRESENTATION INTENTIONAL TORT PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE CLUTCH & BRAKE COMPONENTS STRICT LIABILITY - CLUTCH & BRAKE COMPONENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAHILL CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant