This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:25:32 (UTC).

WILLIAM GHADIMI VS YEON SUN KIM

Case Summary

On 12/02/2015 WILLIAM GHADIMI filed an Other lawsuit against YEON SUN KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0988

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GHADIMI WILLIAM

KAMRAN GHADIMI M.D.

ROES 1-00

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BLISS JACK

DOES 1-100

FOLEY LORRAINE

J&P REALTY INC.

KIM YEON SUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GINAM LEE

ROBENS LAMB

SIDNEY F. CROFT

LEE GINAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • at 08:29 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party); M.D. KAMRAN GHADIMI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by JACK BLISS (Legacy Party); J&P REALTY, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Second Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by JACK BLISS (Legacy Party); J&P REALTY, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • Summons; Filed by JACK BLISS (Legacy Party); J&P REALTY, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by JACK BLISS (Legacy Party); J&P REALTY, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Answer; Filed by JACK BLISS (Legacy Party); J&P REALTY, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by WILLIAM GHADIMI (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by M.D. KAMRAN GHADIMI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.