This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 06:33:24 (UTC).

WILLIAM ANDROLIA ET AL VS ENTERTAINMENT CENTER LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2014 WILLIAM ANDROLIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENTERTAINMENT CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and VICTOR E. CHVEZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4479

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

VICTOR E. CHVEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ANDROLIA LINDA

ANDROLIA WILLIAM

Claimant

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CBRE INC

DOES 1-10

ENTERTAINMENT CENTER LLC

MARTIN BROS.

TASLIMI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

TRAMMEL CROW COMPANY (DOE 3)

BROS. MARTIN

TRAMMEL CROW COMPANY DOE 3

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

TRAMMEL CROW COMPANY (DOE 3)

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MARTIN BROS.

TASLIMI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

AREF & ASSOCIATES

ROUNDTREE GLASS CO. (MOE 1)

MARTIN BROS./MARCOWALL INC. (MOE 2)

DLA PIPER LLP

MARTIN BROS./MARCOWALL INC. MOE 2

ROUNDTREE GLASS CO. MOE 1

ROUNTREE GLASS CO. MOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VANGELDER ALAN LAWRENCE

VANGELDER ALAN L.

GREENE BROILETT & WHEELER LLP

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E. BISHOP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHILDS MARY ESQ.

GOLDSTEIN ROY D. ESQ.

TYSON ROBERT F. JR. ESQ.

DEMETRUIS CHRISTINE CAROL

FREDERICK J. ALAN ESQ.

SUSSON MARK ESQ.

FISCHER-REYES JENNIFER L. ESQ.

HARRISON MATTHEW P.

TYSON ROBERT F. JR.

FISCHER-REYES JENNA ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MCINTYRE ANNE K. ESQ.

SEROTA LORI D. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FISCHER-REYES JENNA ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

FREDERICK JOHN ALAN II

SANTA-ROMANA MARK V. III

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE A TRIAL DATE SET; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TAYLOR RAYFIELD; EXHIBIT

1/24/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE A TRIAL DATE SET; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TAYLOR RAYFIELD; EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF RULING ON LONG CAUSE DETERMINATION

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON LONG CAUSE DETERMINATION

APPLICATION OF ENTERTAINMENT CENTER, LLC FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT WITH PLAINTIFFS

6/22/2018: APPLICATION OF ENTERTAINMENT CENTER, LLC FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT WITH PLAINTIFFS

AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT OF TASLIMI CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

4/1/2015: AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT OF TASLIMI CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

Proof of Service -

6/17/2015: Proof of Service -

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT HEARING BY DEFENDANT AREF AND ASSOCIATES; ETC.

1/22/2016: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT HEARING BY DEFENDANT AREF AND ASSOCIATES; ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/14/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF BRIAN C. O'HARA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/14/2016: DECLARATION OF BRIAN C. O'HARA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF CBRE, INC. OFF CALENDAR IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF CBRE, INC. OFF CALENDAR IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

DECLARATION OF ALAN VAN GELDER FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBITS

7/25/2016: DECLARATION OF ALAN VAN GELDER FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBITS

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ENTERTAINMENT CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/25/2016: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ENTERTAINMENT CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION OF TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/5/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION OF TRAMMELL CROW COMPANY, LLC, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/17/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AGENT ORANGE; ETC

5/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AGENT ORANGE; ETC

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 20; ETC

5/8/2017: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 20; ETC

DEFENSE JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION

5/19/2017: DEFENSE JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION

OPPOSITION OF AREF & ASSOCIATES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE SEEKING CHANGES TO COURT SCHEDULE

5/24/2017: OPPOSITION OF AREF & ASSOCIATES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE SEEKING CHANGES TO COURT SCHEDULE

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AREF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 28; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/30/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AREF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 28; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

399 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 8, Victor E. Chvez, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 8, Victor E. Chvez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion in Limine - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 8, Victor E. Chvez, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Taslimi Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 8, Victor E. Chvez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 8, Victor E. Chvez, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
842 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CBRE, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT CBRE, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketNotice; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff); Linda Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by William Androlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERTAINMENT CENTER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TASLIMI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DLA PIPER LLP US is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE INC is a litigant