Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2020 at 17:14:00 (UTC).

WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER VS. RON ROSS

Case Summary

On 09/28/2016 WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RON ROSS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7318

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS

HOMEOWNERS WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER

Defendant

ROSS RON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAPKIN GITLIN & BEAUMONT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

9/28/2016: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - AMENDED

9/28/2016: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - AMENDED

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/6/2016: Notice of Lis Pendens

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-22 00:00:00

6/22/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-22 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

9/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

9/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

9/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

9/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/3/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRIS ALBRECHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR OSC RE CONTEMPT

9/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRIS ALBRECHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR OSC RE CONTEMPT

Application - PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER FOR CONTEMPT SHOULD NOT ISSUE; DECLARATIONS OF CHRIS ALBRECHT AND EUGENE RUBINSTEIN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/12/2019: Application - PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER FOR CONTEMPT SHOULD NOT ISSUE; DECLARATIONS OF CHRIS ALBRECHT AND EUGENE RUBINSTEIN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/12/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT (CCP...)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT (CCP...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRIS ALBRECHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR HEARING ON OSC RE CONTEMPT

6/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRIS ALBRECHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR HEARING ON OSC RE CONTEMPT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/12/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER FOR CONTEMPT SHOULD NOT ISSUE

8/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER FOR CONTEMPT SHOULD NOT ISSUE

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Plaintiffs Nonopposition To Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why An Order For Contempt Should Not Issue); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CCP 1209) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CC...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiffs Notice Of Non Opposition To Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why An Order For Contempt Should Not Issue); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for an OSC Re: Contempt (CCP 1209); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Chris Albrecht In Support Of Plaintiffs Application For Hearing On Osc Re Contempt); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Eugene Rubinstein In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why An Order For Contempt Should Not Issue); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CCP 1209) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request to Enter Default; ENTERED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case (- AMENDED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC057318    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 7/2/20

Case #PC057318

APPLICATION/MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT

Application filed on 6/10/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Westridge Valencia Master Homeowners Association

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Ron Ross

RELIEF REQUESTED: The setting of an order to show cause why Defendant should not be held in contempt for failing to comply with this Court’s 10/3/17 Judgment enjoining Defendant from conducting further construction to the exterior of his property and requiring Defendant to either obtain approval from Plaintiff for all exterior repairs/modifications to the outside of his property or to remove unauthorized improvements he made to the exterior of his unit.

Additionally, Plaintiff seeks reimbursement of all attorney’s fees and costs incurred in the preparation and appearance of this motion.

RULING: The application/motion is placed off calendar.

In this court’s 11/14/19 ruling on Plaintiff’s prior application/motion for the same relief, the court noted that Defendant has never appeared in this action and, therefore, has no address of record. (See 11/14/19 Minute Order, p.2, first full paragraph). The court went on to note that since Defendant never appeared on this action, he should have been personally served with the application. Id. Rather, than complying with this court’s directive to personally serve Defendant, Plaintiff served the instant application/motion via Federal Express.

Even if the application could have been properly served via Federal Express, such service was untimely. The application/motion was served on Defendant by Federal Express Overnight Delivery on 6/10/20 for the 7/2/20 hearing date. Such service did not provide the 16 court days plus 2 calendar days notice required when a motion is served by an overnight delivery method. See CCP 1005(b).

There is no opposition/response to the application/motion by Defendant to cure the foregoing defects in service. Therefore, the hearing is placed off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTRIDGE VALENCIA MASTER HOMEOWNERS is a litigant