This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2019 at 20:12:05 (UTC).

WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION VS VIEWCOR LONG BEACH I, LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2012 WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against VIEWCOR LONG BEACH I, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7920

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION A CA. NONPROFIT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HARBORCOR LLC A CA. LIMITED LIABILITY

STARLINE WINDOWS INC. A WASHINGTON

VIEWCOR LONG BEACH I LP A DELAWARE

VIEWCOR LONG BEACH II LP A DELAWARE

LEDCOR BUILDERS INC. DOE 11

LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

Cross Defendants

AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION

ZOES 1 THROUGH 300 INCLUSIVE

PROTECTO WRAP COMPANY ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FENTON GRANT MAYFIELD KANEDA & LITT LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D. COHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketReply; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by PROTECTO WRAP COMPANY, (ROE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketReply to Opposition; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff); VIEWCOR LONG BEACH I, LP, A DELAWARE (Legacy Party); VIEWCOR LONG BEACH II, LP, A DELAWARE (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by PROTECTO WRAP COMPANY, (ROE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
374 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department G; (Order to Show Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by WEST OCEAN ASSOCIATION, A CA. NONPROFIT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by VIEWCOR LONG BEACH I, LP, A DELAWARE (Legacy Party); VIEWCOR LONG BEACH II, LP, A DELAWARE (Legacy Party); HARBORCOR, LLC, A CA. LIMITED LIABILITY (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less