This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 16:42:20 (UTC).

WESLEY ROBINSON VS. 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2012 WESLEY ROBINSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6042

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON WESLEY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

24 HOUR FITNESS MAGIC JOHNSON SPORT

24 HOURT FITNESS USA INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE

GATEWAY OPPORTUNITY FUND LLC

MAGIC JOHNSON ENTERPRISES INC.

24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC.

CAL SELECT BUILDERS INC.

PRISM IQ PARTNERS LLC

MANVILLE JOHNS

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

ROES 101 TO 110 INCLUSIVE

COMMERCIAL ROOF MANAGEMENT INC.

FOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

CIRCLE CITY ROOFING INC.

Not Classified By Court

LALLANDE M. LAWRENCE SR. ESQ.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISSNER WERNER R. LAW OFFICES OF .

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD BARNES &

HIGGINS HARRIS SHERMAN & ROHR

THE LEE LAW GROUP PC

Cross Defendant Attorneys

ZINN & LORAND

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC

MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY & FEENEY

NORRIS ARCHER ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. FOR INDEMNIFICATION, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/13/2013: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. FOR INDEMNIFICATION, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/15/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SEERLEMENT; AND DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. BAZZO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THERETO

6/4/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SEERLEMENT; AND DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. BAZZO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THERETO

RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/10/2013: RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

7/17/2013: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/5/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/6/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/6/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/8/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/19/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/20/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/7/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CAL SELECT BUILDERS, INC. ON NOVEMBER 28, 2012 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO X-COMPLT FILED 11/28/14 BY CAL SELECT BUILDERS, INC. ) Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (cross complaint filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (cross-complaint filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (cross-complaints filed by Gateway Opportunity Fund, LLC and by Prism IQ Partners, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (cross-complaints of Gateway Opportunity Fund, LLC and of Prism IQ Partners, LLC ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (cross-complaint filed by Circle City Roofing, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order (RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference (AND NOTICE OF FURHTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Partial Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT 24 HOUR FITNESS MAGIC JOHNSON SPORT and DEFENDANT MAGIC JOHNSON ENTERPRISES, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Stipulation (RE: LIABILITY, PROPER DEFENDANTS AND DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL SELECT BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where 24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC is a litigant