This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2019 at 02:44:26 (UTC).

WEN HONG XIA ET AL VS YUNNAN IMPRESSION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2014 WEN HONG XIA filed a Labor - Workplace Harassment lawsuit against YUNNAN IMPRESSION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN, VICTOR E. CHAVEZ and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6162

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

VICTOR E. CHAVEZ

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HOU CHUNYAN

XIA WEN HONG

ZANG XIAN XIANG

Defendants and Respondents

AI FEN LI

CHANG FAN CHUNG

CHEN DEHUA

DEHUA CHEN

DOES 1-50

FAN CHUNG CHANG

GREEN GARDEN TRADING INC.

K & H GROUP INC.

LI AI FEN

OU DONXIAO

WANG XUAN HUA

WEN YIBING

XIE SHANE

XUAN HUA WANG

YUNNAN IMPRESSION INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MICHAEL SWIFT

LAW OFFICES OF RAY HSU

HSU CHIALEI

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GARY HOLLINGSWORTH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/31/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

NOTICE OF UNVAILABILITY

10/20/2014: NOTICE OF UNVAILABILITY

STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2014: STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

11/13/2014: Unknown

DECLARATION OF FAN CHUNG CHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/6/2015: DECLARATION OF FAN CHUNG CHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES - VOLUME 1 - EXHIBITS 1-36

5/6/2015: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES - VOLUME 1 - EXHIBITS 1-36

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/12/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

7/1/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Proof of Service

7/8/2015: Proof of Service

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR DEFENDANT SHANE XIE FOR THE FIRST TO TENTH CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY

7/8/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR DEFENDANT SHANE XIE FOR THE FIRST TO TENTH CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY

PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF GARY HOLLINGSWORTH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC.

7/13/2015: PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF GARY HOLLINGSWORTH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC.

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANTS YUNNAN IMPRESSION, INC., DONXIAO OU, SHANE XIE, DEHUA CHEN, FAN CHUNG CHANG,

7/14/2015: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY DEFENDANTS YUNNAN IMPRESSION, INC., DONXIAO OU, SHANE XIE, DEHUA CHEN, FAN CHUNG CHANG,

RULINT

7/20/2015: RULINT

PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I PLAINTIFFS? MOTION N LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE THAT WAS RESPONSIVE TO PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION NOTICES AND REQUEST FOR DOC

8/24/2015: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I PLAINTIFFS? MOTION N LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE THAT WAS RESPONSIVE TO PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION NOTICES AND REQUEST FOR DOC

DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL VERDICT RE PLAINTIFF XIAN XIANG ZANG'S CLAIMS AGAINST FAN CHUNG CHEN, XUAN HUA WANG AND AI FEN LI

9/2/2015: DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL VERDICT RE PLAINTIFF XIAN XIANG ZANG'S CLAIMS AGAINST FAN CHUNG CHEN, XUAN HUA WANG AND AI FEN LI

DEFENDANTS'' SPECIAL VERDICT RE PLAINTIFF CHUNYAN HOU''S CLAIMS AGAINST FAN CHUNG CHEN, XUAN HUA WANG AND AI FEN LI

9/2/2015: DEFENDANTS'' SPECIAL VERDICT RE PLAINTIFF CHUNYAN HOU''S CLAIMS AGAINST FAN CHUNG CHEN, XUAN HUA WANG AND AI FEN LI

Minute Order

9/22/2015: Minute Order

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Wen Hong Xia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Case is reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding; Further Proceedings - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice-Related Cases (Notice of Related Case -Re: BC698601, Xia v. Yunnan Impression, Inc., et al ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Memo of Costs on Appeal ($660.00 (YUNNAN IMPRESSION INC) COSTS ON APPEAL APPROVED 4/23/18 COSTS ENTERED BASED ON REMITTITUR ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Notice (of unavailability ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (10 filed this date separately ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wen Hong Xia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Wen Hong Xia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less