This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 08:07:48 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9196

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

ASSIL ABRAHAM B.

CANICO CAPITAL GROUP LLC

DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 50

EL MARINO LLC

ESHAGHIAN GEORGE

GALAM MICHAEL

GALAM MIKE

HAKAKIAN DJAVID

IJ PROPERTIES LLC

INDUSTRIAL ROAD 2440

JAVDANFAR ISAAC

KNOTTING HILL LLC

NAZARIAN SOLEIMAN

NEJATHIAM MORRIS

PANAH ED

RHINO BARE PROJECTS LLC

S DOUBLE LLC

SADIGHPOUR MEHRAN

SAMOOHA KAMRAN

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARTON KLUGMAN & OETTING LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NOVIAN FARID ESQ.

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER & CASPINO

LEBEDEV GENNADY L. ESQ.

SAMUELS GREEN & STEEL LLP

BUBMAN MICHAEL E. ESQ.

EDMONDSON J. CURTIS ESQ.

STANTON MITCHEL T. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

ALTMAN BRYAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

10/3/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

10/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

10/18/2013: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

12/10/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/22/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS? VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

1/31/2014: RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS? VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS? VERIFIED ANSWER TO WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION?S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

1/31/2014: RON KAYE AND STEVE FERRARIS? VERIFIED ANSWER TO WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION?S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

3/18/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/7/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/8/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

CROSSDEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS- COMPLAINT

5/28/2014: CROSSDEFENDANTS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS- COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

8/20/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ORDER FOR JUDGMENT ON WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION?S MOTION FOR INTERPLEADER; NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL BETWEEN CLAIMANTS IN INTERPLEA DER

8/21/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER FOR JUDGMENT ON WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION?S MOTION FOR INTERPLEADER; NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL BETWEEN CLAIMANTS IN INTERPLEA DER

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/5/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

1/28/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Defendant); Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Defendant); Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Canico Capital Group, LLC (Defendant); Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketWELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S VERIVIED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rhino Bare Projects LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CANICO CAPITAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTMAN BRYAN CHARLES