This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2016 at 05:06:35 (UTC).

WELLERCOURT INVESTMENT LLC VS JANET M MA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2013 WELLERCOURT INVESTMENT LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JANET M MA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7962

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLER COURT INVESTMENT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

MA JANET M.

SHIN YOUNG AE

SPICE CRAB SHACK

SHIN YOUNG

SUSHI BOY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PARK & LIM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JOHNSON WILLIAM D. ESQ.

LEE YOHAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE-SUMMONS-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

12/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE-SUMMONS-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

12/12/2013: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Minute Order

2/7/2014: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LEASE AGREEMENT; AND 2.COMMON COUNTS.

2/11/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LEASE AGREEMENT; AND 2.COMMON COUNTS.

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/4/2014: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/16/2014: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Unknown

5/12/2014: Unknown

CROSS-DEFENDANT JANET M. MA AND YOUNG AE SHIN?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/19/2014: CROSS-DEFENDANT JANET M. MA AND YOUNG AE SHIN?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ESTABLISH ADMISSIONS BY JANET MA, AND FOR SANCTIONS

10/10/2014: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ESTABLISH ADMISSIONS BY JANET MA, AND FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ESTABLISH ADMISSIONS BY YOUNG SHIN, AND FOR SANCTIONS

10/10/2014: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ESTABLISH ADMISSIONS BY YOUNG SHIN, AND FOR SANCTIONS

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHI BOY TO PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/14/2014: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHI BOY TO PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/14/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF TRIAL, AND OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/14/2014: NOTICE OF TRIAL, AND OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/20/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DECLARRTION OF WILLIAM D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REINSTATE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

10/24/2014: DECLARRTION OF WILLIAM D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REINSTATE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

TRIAL BRIEF OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHIBOY, INC.; AND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM D. JOHNSON

11/18/2014: TRIAL BRIEF OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHIBOY, INC.; AND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM D. JOHNSON

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHI BOY, INC., FOR ATTORNEY FEES; ETC

2/13/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUSHI BOY, INC., FOR ATTORNEY FEES; ETC

RULING: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

3/18/2015: RULING: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND FINAL JUDGMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Order (RULING granting motion for attorney's fees in the amount of $45,542.50 ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Motion (FOR ATTORNEY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Notice (OF DECISION AT TRIAL, PROPOSED JUDGMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs ($1,991.00 (sushi boy, inc) COSTS ENTERED 01/15/15 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 01/15/15 ) Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Proof of Service (RE PROPOSED JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Brief (trial brief ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • List of Exhibits (OF CROSS-COMLAINANT SUSHI BOY, INC., INCLUDING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (to file first amended complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Answer to Complaint (FOR UD ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

erior Cou}t ot California Su(%ounty of Los Angeles

DEC 16 2014

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

2/ nz. s

[BRSPESED | JUDGMENT ON [ ‘

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SUSHI BOY, INC.

AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANTS JANET

OHes? by :

Plaintiff,