Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 01:16:15 (UTC).

WEIMING LI ET AL VS HTC CONSULTING LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2013 WEIMING LI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HTC CONSULTING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1765

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LI WEIMING

LI WILSON

Defendants and Respondents

CHANG HEYWOOD

CHEN TONI

DOES 1-100

HTC CONSULTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BIN LI PLC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CHANG PEIWEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

Notice of Ruling

12/13/2018: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

6/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

8/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH I. GROSS

12/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH I. GROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/2/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/2/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF HTC CONSULTING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, TO COMPLAINT

4/5/2013: ANSWER OF HTC CONSULTING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/12/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/19/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

MINUTE ORDER

9/3/2013: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING

9/4/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

JOINT STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STAYING THIS ACTION AND ORDER

10/5/2015: JOINT STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STAYING THIS ACTION AND ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO VACATE STAY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME FOR NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STAY; ETC.

7/8/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF TO VACATE STAY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME FOR NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STAY; ETC.

PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE STAY

7/25/2016: PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE STAY

Minute Order -

12/15/2017: Minute Order -

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Hearing02/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by Weiming Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kenneth I. Gross); Filed by Weiming Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Heywood Chang (Defendant); Toni Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Heywood Chang (Defendant); Toni Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 2:26 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Weiming Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FRAUD AND DECEIT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC501765    Hearing Date: February 17, 2021    Dept: 56


Case Number: BC590284    Hearing Date: February 17, 2021    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CESAR ROMERO, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

BROCCA CUSTOM FINISHING CARPENTRY, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC590284

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE TIMELINESS OF JURY FEES DEPOSIT AND JURY WAIVER

Date: February 17, 2021

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

California Code of Civil Procedure § 631 provides that jury fees are due on or before the date scheduled for the initial case management conference in the action, and that a party waives trial by jury by failing to timely file jury fees. Here, the initial case management conference was held on June 9, 2016, and no jury fees were posted on or before that date. Although defendant Jerry Guzman purported to post jury fees on November 2, 2016, those fees were not timely posted and the parties waives trial by jury. The trial set to commence on February 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. shall be a bench trial.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated this 19th day of February 2021

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court