This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 12:08:23 (UTC).

WAYNE BALL VS HINES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2015 WAYNE BALL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HINES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM, RALPH C. HOFER, RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8874

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

RALPH C. HOFER

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BALL WAYNE

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

HINES L.L.C.

HINES MIP FOOTHILL L.L.C.

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. (DOE 1)(ROE 1)

RELIANCE COMPANY

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. (DOE 1)

DOES 1 TO 50

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. DOE 1ROE 1

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. DOE 1

NATIONAL READY MIX

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. (ROE 1)

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. ROE 1

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

HINES MIP FOOTHILL L.L.C.

RELIANCE COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50

Others

VAN DAM & VAN DAM APLC

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BELGUM & FRY LAW OFFICES OF

FRY GARRETT

GIBSON ROBB & LINDH LLP

VAN DAM JAMES S. ESQ.

VAN DAM & VAN NAM APLC

FRY GARRETT R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ARCHER NORRIS

ARCHER NORRIS APLC

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC

Other Attorneys

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

THORSON ERIC WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/2/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

4/16/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

SUMMONS

4/16/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/19/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/4/2015: DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/5/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/11/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FOR INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RFLIEF AGAINST ROES 1 THROUGH 20

6/12/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FOR INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RFLIEF AGAINST ROES 1 THROUGH 20

Unknown

6/12/2015: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/13/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. DBA RELIANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/8/2015: ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. DBA RELIANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ROE AMENDMENT OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

10/15/2015: ROE AMENDMENT OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS, CROSS-COMPLAINT AND ROE AMENDED OF CROSS-COMPLAINT AS TO ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. (ROE 1)

11/2/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS, CROSS-COMPLAINT AND ROE AMENDED OF CROSS-COMPLAINT AS TO ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. (ROE 1)

ANSWER OF ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. DBA RELIANCE COMPANY TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

12/1/2015: ANSWER OF ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. DBA RELIANCE COMPANY TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY COBALT CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Unknown event - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause re: Mandatory Settlem...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC. (DOE 1) (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (OSC RE Dismissal; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
247 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (re deft Hines LLC ONLY ); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WAYNE BALL (Plaintiff); Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HINES MIP FOOTHILL LLC DBA THE ELLINGTON is a litigant