This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 14:26:34 (UTC).

WARREN LYNCH ET AL VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES

Case Summary

On 06/02/2011 WARREN LYNCH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, ANTHONY J. MOHR, EMILIE H. ELIAS, LEE SMALLEY EDMON, SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and JOSEPH R. KALIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2681

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

ANTHONY J. MOHR

EMILIE H. ELIAS

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

JOSEPH R. KALIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR MANUEL [BC486711]

BRADLEY BERNARD

GEBREYESUS FREWOINI

LYNCH WARREN

MANSOUR SALIB [BC502980]

SANCHEZ ARTURO

SINGLETON TERRIKA

URIBE UBALDO [BC492881]

WALKER DWAYNE [BC466613]

Defendants

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. [BC466613]

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. [BC486711]

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. [BC492881]

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. [BC502980]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALVIN L. PITTMAN LAW OFFICES OF

ARI E. MOSS LAW OFFICES OF

JAMES HAWKINS APLC

KENNETH A. GOLDMAN LAW OFFICES OF

PHILIP A. BUCKNOR JR. LAW OFFICES OF

RASTEGAR LAW GROUP

THE SPIVAK LAW FIRM

ZORIK MOORADIAN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

CASEY DEMIAN ESQ.

GAREEB LAW GROUP APC

CASEY DEMIAN MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/8/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]

12/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]

SUMMONS -

6/2/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 201 UNLAWFUL FAILURE TO PAY REQUIRED OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

6/2/2011: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 201 UNLAWFUL FAILURE TO PAY REQUIRED OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

7/20/2011: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

AMENDED SUMMONS

8/4/2011: AMENDED SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO RLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/8/2011: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO RLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND CUMPIANT

8/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND CUMPIANT

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

8/22/2011: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/7/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

9/12/2011: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/12/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2011: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

11/14/2011: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/30/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

12/1/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/20/2012: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF RANGI H. PERERA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES PMK

7/2/2012: DECLARATION OF RANGI H. PERERA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES PMK

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Warren Lynch (Plaintiff); Bernard Bradley (Plaintiff); Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 307; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-07-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2011
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 324; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2011-06-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Warren Lynch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 201 UNLAWFUL FAILURE TO PAY REQUIRED OVERTIME WAGES; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Warren Lynch (Plaintiff); Bernard Bradley (Plaintiff); Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASEY DEMIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASEY DEMIAN M