This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 09:00:29 (UTC).

WALTON LAW GROUP VS YELLOW HILLS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2015 WALTON LAW GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YELLOW HILLS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6822

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN R. WALTON

WALTON LAW GROUP

Defendants and Respondents

4Y RESOURCES LLC

CHAMA LAND LLC

DOES 1-50

DUERR ALBERT

JORDAN DOUG

YELLOW HILLS LLC

YU YUAN

Other

MCBRATNEY DARREN T. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN R. WALTON

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MCBRATNEY DARREN T. ESQ.

PAQUIN DAVID C.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/26/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/26/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATIOIN, NOTICE OF CASE ASS1GNMENT AND VOLUNTARY EFFF1CIENT LITIGATION STIPULATIONS D

4/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATIOIN, NOTICE OF CASE ASS1GNMENT AND VOLUNTARY EFFF1CIENT LITIGATION STIPULATIONS D

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/13/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

(1) DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; (2) MEMORANDUM; AND (3) [PROPOSED] ORDER [LODGED SEPARATELY AND CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH]

5/4/2015: (1) DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; (2) MEMORANDUM; AND (3) [PROPOSED] ORDER [LODGED SEPARATELY AND CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH]

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/21/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/31/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

8/3/2015: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT 1 TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/3/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT 1 TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/3/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

8/4/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

Unknown

8/12/2015: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2015: Unknown

FURTHER CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (FILED PER COURT ORDER OF AUGUST 3, 2015

8/21/2015: FURTHER CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (FILED PER COURT ORDER OF AUGUST 3, 2015

Minute Order

8/27/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

9/4/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

(1)DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FURTHER CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) MEMORANDUM; AND (3) [PROPOSED] ORDER [LODGED SEPARATELY AND CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH]

9/15/2015: (1)DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FURTHER CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) MEMORANDUM; AND (3) [PROPOSED] ORDER [LODGED SEPARATELY AND CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH]

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Walton Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING FOR THE HEARING ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 36; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Walton Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING FOR THE HEARING ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 36; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Yellow Hills, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • (1) DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; (2) MEMORANDUM; AND (3) [PROPOSED] ORDER [LODGED SEPARATELY AND CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Walton Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATIOIN, NOTICE OF CASE ASS1GNMENT AND VOLUNTARY EFFF1CIENT LITIGATION STIPULATIONS DN YELLOW HILLS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Walton Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Walton Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALTON LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCBRATNEY DARREN T.