This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:10:33 (UTC).

WALD, CHARLOTTE K. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 WALD, CHARLOTTE K - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8204

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALD LEA SHARON

Claimant

ALL TOWN AMBULANCE LLC

Not Classified By Court

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

Decedent

WALD CHARLOTTE K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MITZENMACHER RALPH ESQ

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984) - WILL

11/4/2015: Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984) - WILL

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

11/6/2015: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

12/7/2015: Proof of Publication

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

12/9/2015: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

12/14/2015: Minute Order

Last Will and Testament2

12/14/2015: Last Will and Testament2

Order for Probate

12/24/2015: Order for Probate

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

1/4/2016: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Letters Testamentary

1/4/2016: Letters Testamentary

Application and Order Appointing Probate Referee

1/6/2016: Application and Order Appointing Probate Referee

Notice - OF ADMINISTRATION OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

1/25/2016: Notice - OF ADMINISTRATION OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

Notice of Administration to Creditors

1/25/2016: Notice of Administration to Creditors

Inventory and Appraisement - - $321,290.34

1/25/2016: Inventory and Appraisement - - $321,290.34

Creditors Claim - $250.00

1/26/2016: Creditors Claim - $250.00

Notice of Administration to Creditors

2/23/2016: Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors

2/23/2016: Notice of Administration to Creditors

Inventory and Appraisement - - SUPPLEMENTAL $30,986.07

4/25/2016: Inventory and Appraisement - - SUPPLEMENTAL $30,986.07

Waiver - (No Fee) - of Accounting

5/19/2016: Waiver - (No Fee) - of Accounting

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2016
  • Receipt (On Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Order - Approving Final Account/No Successor Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Account - Final or Waiver (First and Final Report of Executor and Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (of Accounting ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Inventory & Appraisal ($4894.36 Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed by: Petitioner in Pro Per )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee (Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Letters (Full Authority Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Order - Appointing Personal Representative (Full Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Executor Executor: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Appoint Probate of Will Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Will (Will Admitted 2015-12-14 Filed by: Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Proof of Publication (Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Petition - Probate of Will (1st Hearing Date: 12/14/2015 Filed By: Wald, Lea Sharon, Petitioner Repres By: Mitzenmacher, Ralph, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL TOWN AMBULANCE LLC is a litigant