This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 15:48:42 (UTC).

VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC VS CARTER REESE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2012 VOX ENTERTAINMENT INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARTER REESE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and HELEN I. BENDIX. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6610

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

HELEN I. BENDIX

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VOX ENTERTAINMENT

VOX GROUP

SEDLACEK SHAWN

BOX ENTERTAINMENT INC

Defendants and Respondents

HATCH.IM LLC

MCALLISTER ANNIE

MELE JOSH

PMC INC.

REESE CARTER

WU CHRIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION (DOE 1)

PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION DOE 1

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MELE JOSH

REESE CARTER

WU CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIBERATORE ANTHONY A. ESQ.

ANTHONY A. LIBERATORE. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GABRIELSALOMONS LLP

FREEDMAN & TAITELMAN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FREEDMAN & TAITELMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/28/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/7/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY H. KRESHEK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/2/2013: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY H. KRESHEK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/8/2014: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/22/2014: SUMMONS ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

1/8/2015: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFFS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFLNG, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, CARTER REESE, CHIUS WU, JOSH MELE, AND ANNIE MCALLISTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/26/2015: PLAINTIFFS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFLNG, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, CARTER REESE, CHIUS WU, JOSH MELE, AND ANNIE MCALLISTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION OF JAY PENSKE; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY H. KRESHEK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/28/2015: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION OF JAY PENSKE; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY H. KRESHEK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANTS CARTER REESE, CHRIS WU, JOSH MELE, AND ANNIE MCALLISTER'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/1/2015: DEFENDANTS CARTER REESE, CHRIS WU, JOSH MELE, AND ANNIE MCALLISTER'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

6/8/2015: Minute Order -

FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC.

6/18/2015: FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC.

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/19/2015: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/22/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

10/13/2015: Minute Order -

CROSS-DEFENDANTS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFING, LLC, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT, SHAWN SEDLACEK'S JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT

10/13/2015: CROSS-DEFENDANTS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFING, LLC, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT, SHAWN SEDLACEK'S JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO: (1) PLAINTIFFS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFING, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED WITNESS LIST; ETC.

10/26/2015: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO: (1) PLAINTIFFS, VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND VOX STAFFING, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED WITNESS LIST; ETC.

DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF TRACY PERLMAN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 2026.620(C)(1) AND CALIFORNIA EVIDENCE CODE ?

11/5/2015: DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF TRACY PERLMAN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 2026.620(C)(1) AND CALIFORNIA EVIDENCE CODE ?

RULING

12/17/2015: RULING

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vox Entertainment (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 20; (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) (Motion for Good Faith Settlement; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Penske Media Corporation (doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Carter Reese (Legacy Party); Chris Wu (Legacy Party); Josh Mele (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
361 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOX ENTERTAINMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant