Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 04:23:43 (UTC).

VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC VS. NEWHALL COFFEE ROASTING CO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2009 VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWHALL COFFEE ROASTING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET L. OLDENDORF, BURT PINES, STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7118

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET L. OLDENDORF

BURT PINES

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING LLC

Defendants

MCMULLEN KYLE

MCMULLEN MITCHELL

NEWHALL COFFEE ROASTING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEUSTADT & BERRIZ

LAW OFFICES OF NEUSTADT & BERRIZ

BERRIZ ARMANDO J

BERRIZ ARMANDO J.

Defendant Attorney

FISHKIN JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION

12/2/2013: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION

12/17/2013: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

12/23/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Other - - OTHER - RETURN WRIT ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

10/7/2014: Other - - OTHER - RETURN WRIT ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO FILE APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

7/21/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO FILE APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION INCLUDING FIRM NAME

7/21/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION INCLUDING FIRM NAME

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO FILE APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDG...)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO FILE APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDG...)

Application for and Renewal of Judgment

12/2/2020: Application for and Renewal of Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

12/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/2/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketApplication for and Renewal of Judgment; Filed by VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Renewal of Judgment); Filed by VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to File Application for and Renewal of Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION TO FILE APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDG...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information (including Firm Name); Filed by Armando J. Berriz (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (to File Application for and Renewal of Judgment); Filed by VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • DocketOther - (Return Writ on Attachment/Execution); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Armando J Berriz (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Armando J Berriz (Attorney); VOURNAS COFFEE TRADING, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (RE: SUMMONS SERVED NEWHALL COFFEE ROASTING COMPANY, MITCH ANDREW MCMULLEN AGENT BY SUBSERVING SONIA MONJEAU ON 01/14/10); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (RE: SUMMONS SERVED MITCHELL MCMULLEN BY SUBSERVING SONIA MONJEAU ON 1/18/10 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketNotice (Of All Purpose Case Assignment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC047118    Hearing Date: November 09, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 11/9/20

Case #PC047118

MOTION FOR ORDER TO FILE APPLICATION FOR

&

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

Motion filed on 7/21/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Vournas Coffee Trading, LLC

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendants Newhall Coffee Roasting Company and Mitchell McMullen

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order allowing the late filing of an Application for a Renewal of Judgment.

RULING:

In 2009, Plaintiff filed this action against Defendants Newhall Coffee Roasting Company, Mitchell McMullen and Kyle McMullen for breach of contract. Defendant Kyle McMullen filed for bankruptcy. On 6/15/10, default judgment was entered against the remaining defendants in the amount of $657,882.86. Defendants’ motion to set aside the judgment was denied.

A renewal of judgment must be filed within 10 years of the entry of judgment. See CCP 683.010 – CCP 683.220. On 6/9/20, Plaintiff’s attorney e-filed an Application for and Renewal of Judgment. (Berriz Decl., Ex.1, 2). On 6/16/20, the Court clerk served a Notice of Rejection of the application stating that the court address was incorrect, plaintiff’s name did not match the records and other defendants were missing. (Berriz Decl., Ex.2). The defects in the application were Plaintiff’s attorney’s fault. (Berriz Decl.). On 6/16/20, Plaintiff’s attorney attempted to re-file a corrected application; however, it was rejected as being untimely. (Berriz Decl., Ex.3).

Pursuant to CCP 473(b), Plaintiff seeks an order allowing the late filing of an Application For And Renewal of Judgment based on its attorney’s fault. The application is attached to the declaration of attorney Berriz as Ex.4. Upon examination of Ex.4, it appears that the name of the judgment creditor/applicant/plaintiff set forth in number 1 is still incorrect (Cournas Coffee Trading, LLC v. Vournas Coffee Trading, LLC). Also, it is not clear why Andrew Vournas is listed as an applicant as he is not the plaintiff/judgment creditor.

Upon Plaintiff’s submission of a corrected/amended Application For And Renewal of Judgment, the motion will be granted and the application will be entered. Upon the entry of the renewal of the judgment, Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor must serve notice of renewal of the judgment on the judgment debtor pursuant to CCP 683.160.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWHALL COFFEE ROASTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERRIZ ARMANDAO J. ESQ.