This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:02:59 (UTC).

VNET IT, INC VS MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 VNET IT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3030

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VNET IT INC.

Defendants

CHAMOW FAMILY TRUST

CHAMOW RICHARD

DEANCO EQUIPMENT LEASING LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE FINANCIAL LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANORAMA CITY LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY LLC

DEANCO MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

DEANCO PANORAMA CITY HOLDINGS LLC

DEANCO REALCO HOLDINGS LLC

GLENN A MARSHAK HERMAN LIVING TRUST

HERMAN DAVID

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA VITAL SOLUTIONS INC.

THE GLENN AND NATHALIE MARSHAK FAMILY LIV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIRDT JONATHAN WESLEY

Defendant Attorney

GEHRING THOMAS GERALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Dismissal-No appearance) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department A; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing On Demurrer; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department A; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department A; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department A; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by GLENN A MARSHAK HERMAN LIVING TRUST, DATE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by GLENN A MARSHAK HERMAN LIVING TRUST, DATE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA VITAL SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by VNET IT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketMotion-Compel; Filed by MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketMotion-Compel; Filed by VNET IT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VNET IT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketSummons-Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less