Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:18:39 (UTC).

VITA MARTHA GARCIA ET AL VS ANABEL GASCON MELESIO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 VITA MARTHA GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANABEL GASCON MELESIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2286

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GARCIA VITA MARTHA

GARCIA VICTOR

Defendants and Respondents

MELESIO ANABEL GASCON

CURRAC ADRIAN DELGADO

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JESSE MARINO APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/23/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

5/15/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/11/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

11/29/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/29/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vita Martha Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vita Martha Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Vita Martha Garcia (Plaintiff); Victor Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC642286    Hearing Date: February 18, 2021    Dept: 27

Motions to be Relieved as Counsel(Tentative Ruling)

Jesse A. Marino, Esq. seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Vita Martha Garcia and Victor Garcia Plaintiffs have failed to communicate or cooperate with counsel.  Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted.  (People v. Prince

Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.  The Court notes that trial in this matter is currently not set and no prejudice will result from granting this motion.  Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Plaintiffs.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.