This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:18:10 (UTC).

VISCHER AG VS APOLIO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 VISCHER AG filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against APOLIO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7791

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AG VISCHER

Defendants

APOLIO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC

APOLLO ENTERPRISE SULUTIONS LTD

Not Classified By Court

PITTMAN ADRA L.

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

RODAS ROSALIA

BARRY E. COHEN APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ STEINSAPIR DOHARMANN & SOMMERS

Defendant Attorney

COHEN BARRY E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

1/23/2018: DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SWISS CIVIL PROCEDURE CODE, SWISS DEBT COLLECTION AND BANKRUPTCY CODE)

1/23/2018: PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SWISS CIVIL PROCEDURE CODE, SWISS DEBT COLLECTION AND BANKRUPTCY CODE)

NOTICE OF LODGING OF ORIGINAL SWISS JUDGMENT AUTHENTICATED BY APOSTILLE AND SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF VISCHER AG?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING OF ORIGINAL SWISS JUDGMENT AUTHENTICATED BY APOSTILLE AND SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF VISCHER AG?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES

1/23/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

1/23/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES; AT LEAST $45,710; ETC

1/24/2018: DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES; AT LEAST $45,710; ETC

[CORRECTED] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

1/26/2018: [CORRECTED] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

[CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

1/26/2018: [CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES

1/26/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES

NOTICE OF ERRATA

1/26/2018: NOTICE OF ERRATA

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND/OR DELAYING HEARING

1/29/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND/OR DELAYING HEARING

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND OR TO CONTINUE HEARING OR OPPOSITON; ETC

1/29/2018: DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND OR TO CONTINUE HEARING OR OPPOSITON; ETC

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

2/1/2018: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PEVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEE MOTION; ETC.

2/7/2018: DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PEVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEE MOTION; ETC.

DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO APOLLO'S PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEE MOTION

2/8/2018: DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC. AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO APOLLO'S PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEE MOTION

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

2/13/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF D. WILLIAM HEINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts (APPEAL FILED 5-02-18)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (B289410; NOA 5/2/18; SUPPLEMENTAL;); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service on Notice of Cross-Appeal; Filed by Vischer Ag (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAppellate Order Reinstating Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Correct/Augment Transcript (B289410); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Apolio Enterprise Solutions, Inc (Defendant); Apollo Enterprise Sulutions, Ltd (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Apolio Enterprise Solutions, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
247 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vischer Ag (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vischer Ag (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vischer Ag (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vischer Ag (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT UNDER THE UNIFORM FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT TO ESTABLISH DOMESTIC JUDGMENT BASED ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF COMMERCIAL COURT OF THE CANTON OF ZURICH, SWITZERLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

FLED

Supcrioe Court of Coligrid BARRY E. COHEN, ESQ. (SBN 128198) s Soun of Caioriy BARRY E. COHEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ) h 10866 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 890 ScP 18 2017

Los Angeles, California 90024 (310) 247-8711 Telephone (310) 582-5980 Facsimile

Attorneys for Defendants and Cross- Complainants, APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC. APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR' THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

VISCHER AG, v Swiss Limited Liability CASE NO.: BC637791

DEFENDANTS APOLLO ENTERPRISE

SOLUTIONS, INC AND APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD’S

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Plaintiffs,

a California Corporation; APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, LTD,, a Bermuda Corporation; and DOES 1 to 100, Inclusive

DATE: September 29, 2017 TIME: '9:30 a.m. DEPT: 69

Before Hon. William Fahey

APOLLO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS, INC., ) )

Defendants. ) )

Action Filed on November 3, 2016 1. Introduction and Summary of Judgment

Plaintiff and Cross- defendant Vischer AG’s (“Vischer”) motion for judgment on the pleadings on the cross-complaint improperly attempts to piggyback on the MSJ on their complaint, even improperly incorporating all evidentiary matters into the motion for judgment on the pleadings, notwithstanding Vischer’s concession that this motion is the

functional equivalent of a general demurrer and is therefore limited to the four corners of the

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apollo Enterprise Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant