This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2019 at 10:19:23 (UTC).

VINCE FLAHERTY VS. U.S. BANK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 VINCE FLAHERTY filed an Other lawsuit against U S BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN, ALLAN J. GOODMAN, CESAR C. SARMIENTO, H. JAY FORD III and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8787

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

CESAR C. SARMIENTO

H. JAY FORD III

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAHERTY VINCE

Defendants

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING

BAILEY STEVE

BANK OF AMERICA INC.

COUNTRYWIDE

GATES MARSHALL

GISSINGER ANDREW

GREENWICH CAPITAL ACCEPTANCE INC.

J.P. MORGAN CHASE

JACKSON JONATHON

JAHNKE JOSHUA

KRIPALANI RANJIT

LANDSAFE TITLE

LASALLE BANK

MASON TIMOTHY P.

MCCALLION ANNE D.

MCCLAREN SUSAN

MERSCORP

MILLEMAN LAURA K.

NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

VICTORY PATRICIA L.

LEVIN FREDERICK S.

CALDWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR

DRAPALSKI H. JOSEPH

NEUFELD & MARKS

PAUL HASTINGS JANOFSKY & WALKER

WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK

ROPES & GRAY LLP

MCGUIREWOODS LLP

BUCKLEYSANDLER LLP

AKERMAN SENTERFITT

SENTERFITT AKERMAN

SORICH JOHN M.

PARKER IBRAHJIM & BERG LLC

KUTAK ROCK LLP

BELZER & MURRAY

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/30/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

8/30/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

9/21/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

10/3/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

4/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/20/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/2/2018: Unknown

Reply

7/20/2018: Reply

Notice of Ruling

7/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/1/2019: Minute Order

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension) (To Admit Video Surveillance Evidence) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension) (in support of peremptory challenge) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Belzer & Murray LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (declaration of Vince Flaherty in support of peremptory challenge to judge or in the alternative a motion to recuse); Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (By: Audrey Lehman); Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other To Admit Video Surveillance Evidenc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension) (to extend time to brief the court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,084 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2012
  • Notice of Pendency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; (Case Ordered Reassigned; Case Reassigned for all purposes) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Allan J. Goodman, Presiding; Case Ordered Reassigned - Case Reassigned for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • Minute order entered: 2012-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by VINCE FLAHERTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Request-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO PLFF VINCE FLAHERTY. ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC118787    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: M

CASE NAME: Vince Flaherty v. U.S. BANK, et al.

CASE NO.: SC118787

MOTION: Motion for Reconsideration

HEARING DATE: 10/8/2020

Background

Plaintiff Vince Flaherty seeks reconsideration of an order vacating a prior order allowing video evidence to show that Plaintiff was not served in a separate unlawful detainer action, SC128569. Holly Hill Investments specially appeared to oppose this motion. Holly Hill commenced the SC128569 unlawful detainer action. The Honorable Judge Lisa Hart Cole entered judgment against Plaintiff Flaherty in the unlawful detainer action and Plaintiff was evicted on June 20, 2018.

Legal Standard

A court may reconsider a prior ruling if the party affected provides notice within 10 days of the order it seeks reconsideration of “new or different facts, circumstances, or law.” (Code Civ. Proc. §1008(a).) “[F]acts of which the party seeking reconsideration was aware at the time of the original ruling are not ‘new or different.’” (In re Marriage of Herr (2009) 174 Cal.App.4th 1463, 1468 [citing Garcia v. Hejmadi (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 674, 690].) “The party making the application shall state by affidavit what application was made before, when and to what judge, what order or decisions were made, and what new or different facts, circumstances, or law are claimed to be shown.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1008(a).)

Analysis

Plaintiff has failed to comply with Code of Civil Procedure section 1008(a) by failing to “state by affidavit what application was made before, when and to what judge, what order or decisions were made, and what new or different facts, circumstances, or law are claimed to be shown.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1008(a).). Therefore, the motion for reconsideration is DENIED.

Moreover, this matter was concluded in October 2016. The case is not active, and no further filings will be accepted and/or considered by the Court in this matter.