This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 02:34:26 (UTC).

VILMA IGLESIAS VS CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 VILMA IGLESIAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4921

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

IGLESIAS VILMA

Defendants and Respondents

CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES INC. THE

SKINNER-TWOMEY KAREN

CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES GLOBAL

ALEXANDER HEATHER B.

CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 200

PRICE STEVE

THE CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LIVINGSTON * BAKHTIAR

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES

GIRARDI THOMAS V. ESQ.

BAKHTIAR EBBY S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

HARRIS ADRIA

KENNEDY TRACEY A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

11/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/3/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

4/3/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRACEY A. KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY, THE CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES, INC., AND CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES GLOBALS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRACEY A. KENNEDY IN SUPPORT OF CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY, THE CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES, INC., AND CAPITAL GROUP COMPANIES GLOBALS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL CURRENT DATE...) OF 05/08/2020

5/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL CURRENT DATE...) OF 05/08/2020

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL CURRENT DATES AND DEADLINES, DISMISS DEFENDANT KAREN SKINNER-TWOMEY, AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/8/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL CURRENT DATES AND DEADLINES, DISMISS DEFENDANT KAREN SKINNER-TWOMEY, AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FEDERAL INS. CO, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

9/25/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FEDERAL INS. CO, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

1)ECLARATION OF V1LMA IGLES1AS

3/23/2018: 1)ECLARATION OF V1LMA IGLES1AS

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

11/22/2016: DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

Minute Order -

12/16/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE RAFAEL ONGKEKO

12/30/2016: NOTICE RE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE RAFAEL ONGKEKO

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

6/21/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

PLAINTIFF'S DEFENDANTS MOTION AND JUDGMENT ON AND REQUEST SANCTION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION FOR THE PLEADINGS FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST AND THEIR ATTORNEYS;ETC.

7/5/2017: PLAINTIFF'S DEFENDANTS MOTION AND JUDGMENT ON AND REQUEST SANCTION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION FOR THE PLEADINGS FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST AND THEIR ATTORNEYS;ETC.

Minute Order -

8/30/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

8/31/2017: NOTICE RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Federal Insurance Company to Comply with Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records; Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Hearing11/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Trial Setting Conference (/Status of Dismissal of Defendant Skinner-Twomey) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Federal Ins. Co, to Comply with Deposition Subpoena); Filed by Vilma Iglesias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference /Status of Dismissal of Defendant Sk...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vilma Iglesias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. ACTUAL AND/OR PERCEIVED DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC634921    Hearing Date: February 03, 2021    Dept: 73

2/3/2021

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

VILMA IGLESIAS v. CAPITAL GUARDIAN TRUST COMPANY, et al. (BC634921)

Counsel for plaintiff/moving party: Ebby Bakhtiar, Francis Flynn (Livingston, etc.)

Counsel for defendants/moving parties Capital Guardian, etc., et al.: Tracey Kennedy, et al. (Sheppard, etc.)

Plaintiff’s motion to compel compliance with subpoena issued to Federal Insurance Company (filed 9/25/20; re-filed 1/6/21)

TENTATIVE RULING

The motion is denied. No proof of personal service of the underlying SDT on non-party deponent Federal Ins. Co. (CCP 2025.280(b) No proof of personal service of the motion on non-party Federal Ins. Co. (CRC 3.1346)

Unless waived, notice of ruling by moving party.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital Guardian Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital Group Companies Inc is a litigant