This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2019 at 19:24:02 (UTC).

VILMA AGUILAR VS BLAZE PIZZA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2016 VILMA AGUILAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLAZE PIZZA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8872

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUILAR VILMA

Defendants and Respondents

BLAZE PIZZA LLC

SOUTH GATE BP LLC

CULVER CITY BP LLC

DEL AMO BP LLC

LA METRO BP HOLDING CO. LLC

LA PAZ LAGUNA BP LLC

BP FARMERS MARKET LLC

SANTA ANA BP LLC

ROLLING HILLS BP LLC

CERRITOS BP LLC

GATEWAY USC BP LLC

LA METRO BP HOLDING CO. LLP

DRIZ ALERTO DANIEL

WHITTIER BP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATERN LAW GROUP

MATERN MATTHEW JOHN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CONSTANTINO TRACY WEI ESQ.

WATSON ELISABETH ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

WATSON ELISABETH C. ESQ.

BARBER JOHN L.

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Declaration - -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MILLS INC. FOR RUST CONSULTING,

4/6/2018: Supplemental Declaration - -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MILLS INC. FOR RUST CONSULTING,

Other - - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/20/2018: Other - - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

4/20/2018: Minute Order -

Other - - JUDGMENT

4/20/2018: Other - - JUDGMENT

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

4/18/2019: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons

8/19/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

9/21/2016: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Answer - DEFENDANT BLAZE PIZZA, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/21/2016: Answer - DEFENDANT BLAZE PIZZA, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

10/28/2016: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11/22/2016: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order -

2/2/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/19/2017: Minute Order -

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MAY 25, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

5/19/2017: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MAY 25, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - -PLAINTIFFS VILMA AGUILAR, BRANDON HORIUCHI, AND JOSE MARQUINA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AU

8/23/2017: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - -PLAINTIFFS VILMA AGUILAR, BRANDON HORIUCHI, AND JOSE MARQUINA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AU

Declaration - -DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. MATERN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS VILMA AGUILAR, BRANDON HORIUCHI, AND JOSE MARQUINA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

8/23/2017: Declaration - -DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. MATERN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS VILMA AGUILAR, BRANDON HORIUCHI, AND JOSE MARQUINA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Stipulation and Order - -JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE DECEMBER 4, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

12/1/2017: Stipulation and Order - -JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE DECEMBER 4, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - -

12/4/2017: Minute Order - -

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Minute Order Dated June 4, 2019); Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Final Accounting Report) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Final Accounting Report) of 06/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Final Accounting Report)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jennifer Mills for Rust Consulting, Inc.); Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; (FINAL ACCOUNT) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of Hearing and Order); Filed by Blaze Pizza, LLC (Defendant); LA Metro BP Holding Co., LLC (Defendant); LA METRO BP HOLDING CO., LLP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PIAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 308; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-06-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1] FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED BREAK PERIODS; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vilma Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less