Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 03:58:04 (UTC).

VILLARICO JUAREZ, CLAIRE FRANCES VS JUAREZ, JEFFRY QUA

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 VILLARICO JUAREZ, CLAIRE FRANCES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JUAREZ, JEFFRY QUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DURON, ARMANDO and LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4131

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DURON, ARMANDO

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLARICO JUAREZ CLAIRE FRANCES

Respondent

JUAREZ JEFFRY QUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FELDMAN MICHAEL JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Mail - Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (12/27/2016 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villarico Juarez, Claire ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 12-29-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (12/19/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villarico Juarez, Claire ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villarico Juarez, Claire ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (12/19/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (12/19/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villarico Juarez, Claire ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN MICHAEL JEFFREY