This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:39:43 (UTC).

VILLAREAL, SHARON FAYE BISDA VS. VILLAREAL, BILLY ABALOS

Case Summary

On 12/15/2015 VILLAREAL, SHARON FAYE BISDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VILLAREAL, BILLY ABALOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1488

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLAREAL SHARON FAYE BISDA

Respondent

VILLAREAL BILLY ABALOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon - Filed and Entered on 2016-09-07 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketJudgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon - Filed and Entered on 2016-09-07 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon - Filed and Entered on 2016-09-07 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketMilestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 08-25-16 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final Dec Dis - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (blank FL105,142,150,160 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon, marr. of dom. part. case cover not. of case assgn. ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 01-28-16 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Villareal, Sharon ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketNotice (of Case Assignment to Dept F48 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less