This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2016 at 01:33:23 (UTC).

VIDAL VARGAS VS THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 VIDAL VARGAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8080

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VARGAS VIDAL

Defendant and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHREIBER GARY

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

4/3/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

Unknown

4/9/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/9/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

4/9/2014: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/11/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/29/2014: Minute Order

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/24/2014: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

11/13/2014: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2014
  • Motion Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Proof of Service (LOS ANGELES DISTRICT ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less