Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 12:52:55 (UTC).

VICTOR RAMIREZ VS DEL TACO LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 VICTOR RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DEL TACO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, EMILIE H. ELIAS, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0435

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

EMILIE H. ELIAS

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ VICTOR

Defendants and Respondents

DEL TACO LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RASTEGAR LAW GROUP APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

 

Court Documents

Status Report

3/15/2018: Status Report

Other -

3/16/2018: Other -

Unknown

9/17/2018: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Status Report

3/12/2019: Status Report

Order

3/13/2019: Order

Unknown

3/13/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/13/2019: Minute Order

Status Report

6/10/2019: Status Report

Unknown

6/11/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

6/12/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

11/9/2015: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

11/9/2015: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

Status Report

3/15/2017: Status Report

Other -

3/21/2017: Other -

Status Report

9/5/2017: Status Report

Other -

9/15/2017: Other -

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Message Board Posting (case anywhere); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Joint Status Report; Filed by Victor Ramirez (Plaintiff); Del Taco, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 4:02 PM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Order (re cont. cmc); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/13/2019 and Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Status Report (- Joint); Filed by Del Taco, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Victor Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 324; (Order ReReassignment of Case; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 322; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Victor Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Victor Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Victor Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEL TACO LLC is a litigant