This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2016 at 00:05:40 (UTC).

VICKY BENNETT VS. THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2012 VICKY BENNETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are C. EDWARD SIMPSON and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9813

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT VICKY

Defendants

RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY DOE 2

TEXAS RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY(D)

WL BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC

TEXAS RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendants

MOES 1-50

PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING INC.

ROES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'NEIL & MATUSEK LLP

Defendant Attorneys

BUSTAMANTE & GAGLIASSO APC

CLINTON & CLINTON

MYERS JEFFREY CABOT

YOKA & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT ND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/29/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT ND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF TRIAL

4/17/2013: NOTICE OF TRIAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/14/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (CROSS) (FICTITIOUS ILNCORRECT NAME)

5/30/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (CROSS) (FICTITIOUS ILNCORRECT NAME)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/5/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

6/21/2013: Unknown

DEFENDANT RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/21/2013: DEFENDANT RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/21/2013: DEFENDANT RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/24/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

10/7/2013: NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

10/16/2013: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/22/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/27/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/29/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

W.L. HUTHER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/28/2014: W.L. HUTHER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONT1NUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATESI PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY ][DEPARTMENT 91,92, 93]

3/14/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONT1NUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATESI PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY ][DEPARTMENT 91,92, 93]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue trial and FSC to 01/12/15 and 12/30/14 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketNotice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketNotice (of lien ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of trial ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue trial ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (RE DOE 1 WL BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Performance Contracting Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS JEFFREY CABOT