This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 03:29:22 (UTC).

VICENTE M MARTINEZ ET AL VS AMCORD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2013 VICENTE M MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9522

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ ANA MARIA

MARTINEZ VICENTE M.

Defendants

AMCORD INC.

BASF CATALYST LLC

BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION U.S.A.

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

DENTONS US LLP

MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LAW O/O

WFBM LLP ORANGE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

SUMMONS

1/18/2013: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

1/18/2013: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/13/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/22/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO NMBFIL, INC (FKA BONDO CORPORATION)

6/16/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO NMBFIL, INC (FKA BONDO CORPORATION)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - BASF CATALYSTS LLC

6/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - BASF CATALYSTS LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

11/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DEFT BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.

12/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DEFT BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

2/24/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

2/24/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

3/30/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO AMCORD, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SOCO-WEST, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL JOHN K BICE CO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vicente M. Martinez (Plaintiff); Ana Maria Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less