This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 02:23:51 (UTC).

VERNA FONT VS. LEXHAM MANHATTAN BEACH, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2012 VERNA FONT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEXHAM MANHATTAN BEACH, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, RAMONA G. SEE, CARY NISHIMOTO and REFERENCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8114

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

RAMONA G. SEE

CARY NISHIMOTO

REFERENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FONT VERNA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 200

LEXHAM MANHATTAN BEACH LLC

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

TIARNA REAL ESTATE SERVICES - DOE 1

LEXHAM PRIVATE INVESTORS LLC

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

THYSSEN KRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNBAR DANIEL W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CLINTON & CLINTON

SEROTA LORI

 

Court Documents

Summons

11/9/2012: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

11/29/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

Legacy Document - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/30/2012: Legacy Document - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2012: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order

1/3/2013: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

1/18/2013: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

1/23/2013: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/4/2013: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/15/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Cross-Complaint - THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/15/2013: Cross-Complaint - THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

2/22/2013: Case Management Statement

Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/27/2013: Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/5/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

4/24/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

5/13/2013: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

TH YSSEN.KRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO T1ARNA REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2013: TH YSSEN.KRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO T1ARNA REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/16/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-10-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-05-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department LA91, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Final Status Conference (JURY TRIAL 5/5/14**SEE DISMISSAL OF 4/18/14**) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-04-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: LEXHAM MANHATTAN BEACH, LLC BY SERVING: MARIA BAUTISTA ON 11/20/12 AT 9:50 AM ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketProof of Service by Personal Service; Filed by VERNA FONT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by VERNA FONT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VERNA FONT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant