This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:17:34 (UTC).

VERA, ROSA MARTHA VS VERA MOJICA, SUSANO

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 VERA, ROSA MARTHA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VERA MOJICA, SUSANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3840

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VERA ROSA MARTHA

Respondent

VERA MOJICA SUSANO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Conference - Held - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Brief (MSC ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Held - Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Witness List; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (Rejected- Incomplete ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vera, Rosa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.