This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:36:06 (UTC).

VERA OMAR VS ROSECRANS VILLA RESIDENTIAL CARE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 VERA OMAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROSECRANS VILLA RESIDENTIAL CARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7787

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OMAR VERA

Defendants and Respondents

GOLCHINI KEIVAN. M.D

ROSECRANS VILLA INC

DOES 1-150

ROSECRANS VILLA RESIDENTIAL CARE

KEIVAN GOLCHINI M.D. A MEDICAL CORP.

KEIVAN GOLCHINI M.D.

KEIVAN GOLCHINI M.D. DOE 1

ROSECRANS VILLA INC.

Guardian Ad Litems

BEASLEY BRITTANY (GUARDIAN AD LITEM)

BEASLEY BRITTANY GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OLDMAN COOLEY SALLUS BIRNBERG

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PAPPAS LOUIS W. ESQ.

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

DOBSON MITZIE L. ESQ.

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/11/2018: Unknown

Other -

6/11/2018: Other -

Notice

6/25/2018: Notice

Other -

6/25/2018: Other -

Other -

6/25/2018: Other -

Trial Brief

7/12/2018: Trial Brief

Notice of Settlement

4/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

SUMMONS

1/20/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

3/4/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. WILLFUL MISCONDUCT 3. ELDER ABUSE

4/29/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. WILLFUL MISCONDUCT 3. ELDER ABUSE

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/23/2016: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS, KEIVAN GOLCHINI, M.D., AND KEIVAN GOLCHINI, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND ETC.

6/30/2016: DEFENDANTS, KEIVAN GOLCHINI, M.D., AND KEIVAN GOLCHINI, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND ETC.

ORDER

8/17/2016: ORDER

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

10/27/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE

10/27/2016: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

10/27/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Unknown

2/15/2017: Unknown

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Hearing Re Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Vera Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Vera Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Brittany (Guardian Ad Litem) Beasley (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (To Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
374 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by VERA OMAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Vera Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Vera Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC607787    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: SWB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. B

VERA OMAR,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

BC607787

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

ROSECRANS VILLA RESIDENTIAL CARE, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: November 8, 2019

Moving Parties: Petitioner Brittany Beasley

Responding Party: None

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of Person with a Disability

The court considered the moving papers.

RULING

The court is inclined to grant petitioner’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on behalf of claimant Vera Omar.

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), petitioner and claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition but because of claimant’s health condition, the court finds good cause to dispense with her appearance.

BACKGROUND

On January 20, 2016, Vera Omar filed a complaint against Rosecrans Villa Residential Care, Rosecrans Villa, Inc., and Keivan Golchini, M.D. for negligence, willful misconduct, and elder abuse.

On April 29, 2016, plaintiff filed a FAC.

On August 17, 2016, plaintiff filed a SAC. She alleges that on January 26, 2013, she was admitted to the assisted living facility known as Rosecrans Villa, located in Hawthorne. She was a resident/patient from January 2013 through January 2014, after which she was transferred to Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center. On January 26, 2014, plaintiff suffered a massive stroke sometime shortly after breakfast. Rosecrans Villa contacted Dr. Golchini sometime after plaintiff suffered her stroke and was advised that someone from his office would come to the facility to evaluate plaintiff, but this did not occur. Although plaintiff suffered a stroke shortly after breakfast, defendants failed to call 911 or take any effective standard medical steps to prevent or retard the progression of the stroke until more than eight hours later, at which time she was found to have a seriously altered mental state, altered speech, and left-sided weakness. By this time, she was well beyond the time for TPA therapy. She has never recovered.

DISCUSSION

The court has reviewed the petition and finds the settlement amount to be fair and reasonable.

The parties settled for $400,000, with Medicare reimbursement of $884.09, attorney’s fees of $160,000, attorney costs of $128,044.50, and a reserve of $55,977.75 for Medi-Cal. The balance of proceeds available for claimant is $55,093.67. Counsel’s declaration is sufficient to support the attorney’s fees and costs requested. The litigation was heavily contested and ongoing for three years.

Accordingly, the court is inclined to grant the petition.