This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 22:52:13 (UTC).

VER A. CHACON VS MARIA RITA CISNEROS

Case Summary

On 05/20/2015 VER A CHACON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARIA RITA CISNEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, TORRIBIO, JOHN A., MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and RAUL A. SAHAGUN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4792

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHACON VER A

Defendants

CISNEROS JOAN

CISNEROS MARIA RITA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/20/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

10/6/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-11-25 00:00:00

11/25/2015: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-11-25 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR CORRECTION

12/8/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR CORRECTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

12/21/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-02-26 00:00:00

2/26/2016: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-02-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

5/16/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER

9/21/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

10/31/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Other - - (MEMO: RETURNED MAIL-ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; ORDER/RULING AND MINUTE ORDER 11/17/16.)

12/15/2016: Other - - (MEMO: RETURNED MAIL-ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; ORDER/RULING AND MINUTE ORDER 11/17/16.)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-02-01 00:00:00

2/1/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-02-01 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-05-11 00:00:00

5/11/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-05-11 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-02 00:00:00

4/2/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-02 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-14 00:00:00

6/14/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-14 00:00:00

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: for plaintiff's failure to appear pre...) of 11/21/2018

11/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: for plaintiff's failure to appear pre...) of 11/21/2018

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

5/29/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCourt Order/Ruling (Hearing 9-23-20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 2:34 PM in Department C; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)) of 09/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC064792    Hearing Date: September 23, 2020    Dept: C

CHACON v. CISNEROS, et al.
CASE NO.: VC064792
HEARING: 9/23/20
JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES
[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]
#7
TENTATIVE ORDER
Plaintiff Chacon’s motion to set aside dismissal is DENIED without prejudice.
Moving Party to give NOTICE. 
Plaintiff Chacon moves to set aside the dismissal filed on 11/21/18 pursuant to CCP § 473.
Plaintiff has not attached any proof of service showing that she properly noticed Defendant of the motion.  Further, there is no Opposition from Defendant to indicate that notice was received.
Accordingly, the motion is DENIED without prejudice.