This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:06:43 (UTC).

VENTURE LENDING & LEASING VI INC ET AL VS KICKSEND HOLDINGS

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 VENTURE LENDING LEASING VI INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KICKSEND HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1329

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VENTURE LENDING & LEASING VI INC

VENTURE LENDING & LEASING VII INC

Defendants and Respondents

KICKSEND HOLDINGS INC

DOES 1-20

VERT CAPITAL CORP

POCKET GAMES INC

TRUSTEE OF MARLBOROUGH BROTHERS FAMILY

KENNETH N. ROZENBLUM AS TRUSTEE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

Defendant Attorney

KANG SPANOS & MOOS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT 1) BREACH OF PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

5/20/2016: COMPLAINT 1) BREACH OF PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

6/22/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Minute Order

6/30/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

10/4/2016: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

10/4/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

12/22/2016: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/1/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

STIPULATION RE: SEARCH FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION, CUSTODY OR CONTROL OF THE PARTIES; ORDER THEREON

2/14/2017: STIPULATION RE: SEARCH FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION, CUSTODY OR CONTROL OF THE PARTIES; ORDER THEREON

Minute Order

2/17/2017: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/7/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR (1) TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ETC

3/23/2017: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR (1) TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ETC

Minute Order

3/30/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDERS ENTERED ON MARCH 30, 2017

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF ORDERS ENTERED ON MARCH 30, 2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/8/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/11/2017: Minute Order

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) TERMINATING SANCTIONS; (2) EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; (3) ISSUE SANCTIONS; AND/OR (4) MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS KICKSEND HOLDINGS, INC., VERT CAPITAL CORP.

6/30/2017: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) TERMINATING SANCTIONS; (2) EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; (3) ISSUE SANCTIONS; AND/OR (4) MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS KICKSEND HOLDINGS, INC., VERT CAPITAL CORP.

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Venture Lending & Leasing Vi, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Venture Lending & Leasing Vi, Inc (Plaintiff); Venture Lending & Leasing VII, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Venture Lending & Leasing Vi, Inc (Plaintiff); Venture Lending & Leasing VII, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT 1) BREACH OF PROMISSORY NOTE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Venture Lending & Leasing Vi, Inc (Plaintiff); Venture Lending & Leasing VII, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC621329    Hearing Date: August 05, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

venture lending & Leasing vi, inc., et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

kicksend holdings, inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 621329

Hearing Date:

August 5, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

On October 3, 2017, default judgment was entered against, among others, Defendant Vert Capital Corp. (“Vert”). To enforce its judgment, Plaintiff Venture Lending & Leasing VI, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) now applies for an order for appearance and examination of Adam Levin, the managing director of Vert. The Court finds that Plaintiff has complied with the relevant procedural requirements (CCP § 708.110(a) and LASC Rule 3.221).

Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff’s application and will sign the order for appearance and examination.

DATED: August 5, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vert Capital Corp is a litigant