This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 16:52:54 (UTC).

VENICIO FLORES VS MR C BEVERLY HILLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2013 VENICIO FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MR C BEVERLY HILLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERNEST HIROSHIGE, MICHAEL JOHNSON and MARC MARMARO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7810

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

MICHAEL JOHNSON

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORES VENICIO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 10

MORNING VIEW HOTELS BH LLC

MORNING VIEW HOTELS INC.

MR C BEVERLY HILLS

MR C BEVERLY HILLS LLC

MR C MANAGER LLC

HILLS MR C BEVERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CWIKLO DAVID PETER ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LITTLER MENDELSON APC .

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF VENICIO FLORES? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION, UNLAWFUL EMPLOYER RESTRAINT ON DISCLOSING WORKPLACE CONDITIONS; VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA PUBLIC POLICY AND LABOR CODE ? 232(C),

8/8/2013: PLAINTIFF VENICIO FLORES? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION, UNLAWFUL EMPLOYER RESTRAINT ON DISCLOSING WORKPLACE CONDITIONS; VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA PUBLIC POLICY AND LABOR CODE ? 232(C),

SUMMONS -

8/8/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/5/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/23/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/23/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE

11/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

11/7/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

DECLARATION OF CONNIE L. MICHAELS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

11/7/2013: DECLARATION OF CONNIE L. MICHAELS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

11/7/2013: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

11/8/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/13/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/13/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

11/25/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/22/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/23/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT.

2/11/2014: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT.

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

2/11/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

2/11/2014: Minute Order -

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Venicio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Venicio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Venicio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VENICIO FLORES COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION, UNLAWFUL EMPLOYER RESTRAINT ON DISCLOSING WORKPLACE CONDITIONS; VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA PUBLIC POLICY AND LABOR CODE 232(C), 232.5, ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Venicio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORNING VIEW HOTELS DBA MR. C HOTEL is a litigant