Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:35:06 (UTC).

VAZRIK TSATURYAN VS STEWART BLOOM ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 VAZRIK TSATURYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEWART BLOOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3217

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TSATURYNA VAZRIK

Defendants and Respondents

BLOOM STEWART

CENTER BMW

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

BMW CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SARRAF RAYMOND ESQ.

DORDICK LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorneys

GRAMLING KEVIN J. ESQ.

RAFFALOW BRETOI LUTZ & STELE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/22/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

ALL PARTIES' STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [RULE OF COURT 3.1332(C)(3),(6)]; ETC

9/10/2018: ALL PARTIES' STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [RULE OF COURT 3.1332(C)(3),(6)]; ETC

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/8/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order

2/20/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

3/6/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/6/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

6/9/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/15/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM; CHANGE OF OFFICE LOCATION, PHONE AND FAX NUMBERS

3/24/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM; CHANGE OF OFFICE LOCATION, PHONE AND FAX NUMBERS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

7/3/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/31/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

9/25/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Notice

9/26/2017: Notice

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Vazrik Tsaturyna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial and all discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and all Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and all Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates); Filed by Vazrik Tsaturyna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Appl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Stewart Bloom (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Stewart Bloom (Defendant); Center BMW (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF VAZRIK TSATURYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vazrik Tsaturyna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vazrik Tsaturyna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Vazrik Tsaturyna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC623217    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

vazrik tsaturyan,

Plaintiff,

v.

Stewart Bloom, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC623217

Hearing Date: December 1, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Plaintiff’s Motions to compel depositions

Plaintiff Vazrik Tsaturyan (“Plaintiff”) filed this action following a motor vehicle collision with Defendant Stewart Bloom (“Defendant”). Now, Plaintiff moves to compel depositions of Defendant’s expert witnesses: (1) Laura Fuchs Dolan; (2) Tamera Rockholt; (3) Brian Randles, M.D.; (4) William Hugo Dillin, M.D.; and (5) Mary Jesko. Per Code of Civil Procedure section 2034.460, subdivision (a), a party to an action must produce an expert that party has retained to testify upon service of a proper deposition notice. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2034.460, subd. (a).) As all of these witnesses have been designated as experts, the Court grants the motion and orders all depositions to occur on or before December 31, 2020, unless the parties stipulate to different dates. The Court concludes that both parties have been uncooperative in the scheduling of expert depositions, and concludes that an award of sanctions to either side would be unjust. Accordingly, the Court declines to award sanctions. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.450, subd. (g)(2).) The Court provides notice that if the parties act in this manner in the future, the Court intends to sanction both parties. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: December 1, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARRAF RAYMOND