Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:36:24 (UTC).

VANOWEN REAL ESTATE PARTNERS VS GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION ET A

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 VANOWEN REAL ESTATE PARTNERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7442

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VANOWEN REAL ESTATE PARTNERS

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AGUILAR MARITZA

FIZLI LALI

SECURITY SYSTEMS INC.

GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION

SAFE HOME

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

SAFE HOME DBA SAFE HOME

PROTECTION GLOBAL ALARM

MENJIVAR SANTOS ALVARO

Not Classified By Court

SANTOS ALVARO MENJIVAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ABRAMSON JOE R. ESQ.

SALOMONS GARY K. ESQ.

ABRAMSON JOEY R. ESQ.

ABRAMSON JOEY R.

SALOMONS GARY K.

Defendant Attorneys

LIPARI JOSEPH

DANIELS DENNIS LEE

BURKE AARON J.

SHOOP DAVID

DRUBACH LEONARDO D.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ARMSTRONG WILLIAM H. ESQ.

DANIELS DENNIS L.

Cross Defendant Attorney

ARMSTRONG WILLIAM H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC.

1/25/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT GLOBAL ALARM SYSTEMS TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES AND ETC

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT GLOBAL ALARM SYSTEMS TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES AND ETC

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING I)EFFNDANTS LALI FIZLI, MARITZA AGUII..AR AND SANTOS ALVARO MENU VAR TO: (1) SERVE VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES,

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING I)EFFNDANTS LALI FIZLI, MARITZA AGUII..AR AND SANTOS ALVARO MENU VAR TO: (1) SERVE VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES,

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDERS: (I) COMPELLING DEFENDANT, GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION, TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER OF APRIL 10, 2018, AND; ETC.

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDERS: (I) COMPELLING DEFENDANT, GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION, TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER OF APRIL 10, 2018, AND; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING DEFENDANT, SANTOS ALVARO MENJIVAR, TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT?S ORDER OF APRIL 12,2018, AND TO SERVE VERIFIED ANSWERS (WITHOUT OBJECT

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING DEFENDANT, SANTOS ALVARO MENJIVAR, TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT?S ORDER OF APRIL 12,2018, AND TO SERVE VERIFIED ANSWERS (WITHOUT OBJECT

TENTATIVE RULING

5/16/2018: TENTATIVE RULING

Minute Order

6/20/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

12/20/2018: Opposition

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/20/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

DEFENDANT SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

12/2/2016: DEFENDANT SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/1/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATRORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

9/21/2017: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATRORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

9/21/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/12/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

11/21/2017: Minute Order

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • Hearingat 10:30 AM in Department 96 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 96 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 96 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Compelling Third Party Witness, Derek Lewis, To Comply With Subpoena By Appearing For His Deposition); Filed by Vanowen Real Estate Partners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Vanowen Real Estate Partners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
405 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vanowen Real Estate Partners (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC637442    Hearing Date: April 6, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Vanowen Real Estate Partners,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

BC637442

vs.

Ruling

Global Alarm Protection, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: April 6, 2021

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Moving Party: Dennis Lee Daniels Jr., counsel of record for Defendants Lali Fizli, Maritza Aguilar and Global Alarm Protection

Responding Party: Defendants Lali Fizli, Maritza Aguilar and Global Alarm Protection

T/R: THE MOTION IS GRANTED. COUNSEL TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON DEFENDANT WITHIN 5 DAYS OF NOTICE OF RULING. COUNSEL WILL BE RELIEVED UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER.

COUNSEL TO NOTICE.

The Court considers the moving papers and opposition.

The Court may issue an order allowing an attorney to withdraw from representation, after notice to the client. (CCP § 284.) The attorney may withdraw from representation as long as the withdrawal would not result in undue prejudice to the client’s interest—i.e., counsel cannot withdraw at a critical point in the litigation. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal. App. 4th 904, 915; see California Rule of Professional Conduct 3-700.)

Attorney Dennis Lee Daniels Jr., counsel of record for Defendants Lali Fizli, Maritza Aguilar and Global Alarm Protection, seeks to withdraw from representation of Defendants. Daniels, who works for Fee, Smith, Sharp & Vitullo, acted as local counsel for Aaron Burke, a former partner of Fee Smith not licensed in California. Burke has since left Fee Smith to go to Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC. Burke has recommended two local CA attorneys to act as local counsel for Burke.

Defendants filed a pro per opposition to this motion, even though Burke remains Defendants’ counsel of record. Defendants assert that replacing Daniels would have an “extreme material adverse effect for Defendant’s case.” Defendants assert it would be too hard to find local counsel “comfortable” supporting an unknown attorney. Defendants also assert that trial is “quickly approaching.” These arguments are unpersuasive. Daniels has provided recommendations for new local counsel and trial is set for August 9, 2021. Defendants will not be prejudiced by Daniels’ withdrawal.

The Court finds there is good cause for Daniels’ withdrawal. Daniels has complied with CRC 3.1362. The motion is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL ALARM PROTECTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Security Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFE HOME SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARMSTRONG WILLIAM H.