Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:30:07 (UTC).

VANESSA ULLOA ET AL VS DIANA INVESTMENT

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 VANESSA ULLOA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against DIANA INVESTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM, SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0270

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ULLOA VANESSA

Defendants and Respondents

DIANA INVESTMENT

DOES 1 TO 70

GOLDEN STATE ELEVATOR SERVICE INC. D41

Minors

F. ANGELY

U. VALERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PEREZ & CABALLERO A PROF. LAW CORP.

PEREZ FRANK J

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KUBEC KRISTIN M. ESQ.

LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A. HOLTZ

KUBEC KRISTIN MARIE

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

7/22/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

7/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice

8/2/2019: Notice

Minute Order

7/14/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR REFUND

2/8/2018: REQUEST FOR REFUND

ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTTNUE TRIAL

4/18/2018: ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTTNUE TRIAL

Notice of Ruling

9/28/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Request for Refund / Order

3/19/2019: Request for Refund / Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/4/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/11/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

2/2/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

2/10/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

DEFENDANT GOLDEN STATE ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/12/2017: DEFENDANT GOLDEN STATE ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/12/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

7/14/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; ETC

7/14/2017: PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; ETC

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (site inspection based on Plaintiffs' ex parte filed 7/23/2019) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion to Compel Site Inspection Off Ccalendar); Filed by Vanessa Ulloa (Plaintiff); Valeria U. (Plaintiff); Angely F. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an Order to Continue Trial Date Per Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Complainant Diana Investment Limited Partners...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For an Order to Continue Trial Date); Filed by Diana Investment (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Set Site Inspection on July 29, 2019, to Allow Plaintiffs' Elevator Expert to Inspect the Subject Elevator Based on Parties' Prior Agreement (AMENDED)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Set Site Inspection for July 29, 2019, to Allow Plaintiffs' Elevator Expert to Inspect the Subject Elevator Based on the Parties' Agreement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE: COMMON CARRIER LIABILITY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC600270    Hearing Date: February 25, 2021    Dept: 28

Petitions to Approve Compromises of Pending Actions

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On November 5, 2015, Plaintiffs Vanessa Ulloa and Angely F. filed a complaint against Defendant Diana Investment.  The plaintiffs allege negligence, premises liability, and negligent and strict products liability in the complaint arising from injuries sustained from a defective elevator gate on September 28, 2015.

On February 24, 2017, the plaintiffs filed an amendment to the complaint to rename Doe 41 as Defendant Golden State Elevator Service, Inc.

On January 10, 2020, the Court entered judgment on Defendant Diana Investment and Golden State Elevator Inc.’s behalf and against the plaintiffs.

Costs related to an appeal have been filed.

On January 29, 2021, the Petitioner Vanessa Ulloa filed petitions to approve compromises of pending actions for Claimant Vanessa Ulloa and Angely F.

PARTYS REQUEST

Petitioner Vanessa Ulloa (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimants Vanessa Ulloa and Angely F. (“Claimant”).

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petitions are properly approved.  All required information and attachments have been filed.  The gross settlements are reasonable considering Claimant Angely F. is mostly healed with the exception that her skin grafts on her right foot require protection from sunlight and frictionNo attorney’s fees are requested.  The requested medical expenses and costs are adequately explained.  Thus, the petitions are properly granted.

CONCLUSION

The petition filed on December 24, 2020 is APPROVED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE ELEVATOR SERVICE INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUBEC KRISTIN M. ESQ.