This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:18:46 (UTC).

VANESSA TATE ROBINSON VS B & I GROUP HOME INC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 VANESSA TATE ROBINSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against B I GROUP HOME INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, MAREN E. NELSON and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6265

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

MAREN E. NELSON

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBINSON VANESSA TATE

Defendants and Respondents

B & I GROUP HOME INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 250

ANIH FAVOUR

KITILYA REDISTARD

KIURUWI HUMPHREY URIO

KIURUWI IRENE

VELASQUEZ JUAN

BARILAS SLORIDALMA

ANIH PHILIP

NELSON JOHN

RIVAS GUADALUPE

BOSS JERRI L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM LLP

BUCHANAN JEAN PHAN

LITWIN JOHN FREDERIC

Defendant Attorney

ONWAEZE OGOCHUKWU VICTOR

 

Court Documents

Other -

5/4/2018: Other -

Minute Order

6/19/2018: Minute Order

Complaint

10/16/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order

1/8/2019: Order

Minute Order

1/8/2019: Minute Order

Status Report

3/11/2019: Status Report

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Unknown

5/20/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Order

5/23/2019: Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/4/2016: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

SUMMONS

4/7/2016: SUMMONS

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/7/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/6/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

Declaration

11/17/2017: Declaration

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling (at Status Conference); Filed by Vanessa Tate Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave (To Serve By Publication) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Order (Denying Motion to Serve by Publication Without Prejudice); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave To Serve By Publication; Further ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Message Board Posting (re change in scheduled appearance time set for May 23, 2019 @ 9:00 a.m.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice of Motion and Motion for court order allowing leave to serve by publication; Declaration of Jean P. Buchanan; Filed by Vanessa Tate Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 307; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Status Report INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER COMPLEX CASES AND CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute Order MINUTES ENTERED 10/11/16 COUNTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute Order MINUTES ENTERED 10/11/16 COUNTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vanessa Tate Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510, 1194 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Vanessa Tate Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less