Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 23:39:16 (UTC).

VALERIY DAVYDOV VS TELEDYNE CONTROLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 VALERIY DAVYDOV filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TELEDYNE CONTROLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2446

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVYDOV VALERIY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ELECTRONIC SAFETY PRODUCTS

TELEDYNE CONTROLS

TELEDYNE ELECTRONIC SAFETY PRODUCTS

TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Other

MENARD JEAN-PAUL. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

SAXE DEBORAH C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEZE TAMARA S.

Defendant Attorney

MASTERS ANNA SEGOBIA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/3/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT TELEDYNI TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED DLBIA ELECTRONIC SAFELY PRODUCTS? GENERAL DENIAL TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

12/7/2011: DEFENDANT TELEDYNI TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED DLBIA ELECTRONIC SAFELY PRODUCTS? GENERAL DENIAL TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/12/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER TO ANSWER

12/16/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER TO ANSWER

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, TAMARA S. FREEZE

12/27/2011: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, TAMARA S. FREEZE

Minute Order -

1/17/2012: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT [SECOND AMENDED ANSWER]

2/6/2012: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT [SECOND AMENDED ANSWER]

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/9/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

MEDIATION REFERRAL

2/29/2012: MEDIATION REFERRAL

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TELEDYNE?S FURTHER AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO THE FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATOR! ES - EMPLOYMENT LAW; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN AUTHORITIE

3/12/2012: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TELEDYNE?S FURTHER AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO THE FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATOR! ES - EMPLOYMENT LAW; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN AUTHORITIE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING DEFENDANT?S SUBPOENA, ETC

3/12/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING DEFENDANT?S SUBPOENA, ETC

I. DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VALERIY DAVYDOV?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, NOS. 202.1, 210.2 AND 210.3 AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $2340.00. 2

3/15/2012: I. DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VALERIY DAVYDOV?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, NOS. 202.1, 210.2 AND 210.3 AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $2340.00. 2

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION QUASHING DEFENDANT?S SUBPOENA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND REQUEST FOR AWARD IN THE AMOUNT OF S3,640; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

3/27/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION QUASHING DEFENDANT?S SUBPOENA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND REQUEST FOR AWARD IN THE AMOUNT OF S3,640; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

DEFENDANT TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED D/B/A ELECTRONIC SAFETY PRODUCTS? THIRD AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL

3/29/2012: DEFENDANT TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED D/B/A ELECTRONIC SAFETY PRODUCTS? THIRD AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL

PLA INTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TELEDYNE?S FURTHER AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO THE FIRS?I? SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPI,OYMER4I? LAW

4/4/2012: PLA INTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TELEDYNE?S FURTHER AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO THE FIRS?I? SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPI,OYMER4I? LAW

NOTICE OF RULING AT THE HEARING ON APRIL 24, 2012

4/26/2012: NOTICE OF RULING AT THE HEARING ON APRIL 24, 2012

NOTICE OF ADR NEUTRAL RECUSAL

6/5/2012: NOTICE OF ADR NEUTRAL RECUSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/27/2012: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Valeriy Davydov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketNotice-Reassgnment-Mediator; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Valeriy Davydov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION (DISABILITY) [GOV. CODE 12940(A)]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less