This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 00:42:54 (UTC).

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV LLC. VS. BFH, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BFH, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7415

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC

Defendants

BUDISH GARY

KOCHARIAN SARKIS

BFH LLC.

HARMELL LOREN

BUDISH BABARA

FOX ANDREW C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIDE RICHARD L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request to Enter Default; ENTERED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request to Enter Default; REJECTED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL, IV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L