This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:19:22 (UTC).

VAHE AMBARSOOMZADEH VS CITY OF GLENDALE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2016 VAHE AMBARSOOMZADEH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1535

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMBARSOOMZADEH VAHE

Defendants and Respondents

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

TSOLAKYAN MINAS

MELIK ARTIN

TORRES ERNESTO

COX CASEY

GLENDALE CITY OF

DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

M & K ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA MICHAEL J. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/23/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

5/23/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

6/22/2016: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Minute Order

6/28/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING ALL DATES

7/1/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING ALL DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING ALL DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Glendale, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • at 10:45 AM in Department 91; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Glendale, City of (Defendant); Glendale Police Department (Defendant); Ernesto Torres (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where 24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC is a litigant