This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:48:55 (UTC).

USC CREDIT UNION VS JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 USC CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4356

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

USC CREDIT UNION

Defendants and Respondents

SOLOMON GERALD

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES INC.

SOLOMON FRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRUCE P. NEEDLEMAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

NESBITT PAUL B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/16/2015: SUMMONS

Notice of Change of Address

5/21/2018: Notice of Change of Address

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE P. NEEDLEMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/18/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE P. NEEDLEMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; GERALD SOLOMON AND FRED SOLOMON TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

2/22/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; GERALD SOLOMON AND FRED SOLOMON TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/31/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. BREACH OF NOTE, SECURITY AGREEMENT; ETC

12/16/2015: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. BREACH OF NOTE, SECURITY AGREEMENT; ETC

STIPULATION FOR IMMEDIATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE:

2/14/2017: STIPULATION FOR IMMEDIATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE:

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/2/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

2/14/2017: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

12/29/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

JUDGMENT

2/14/2017: JUDGMENT

DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; GERALD SOLOMON AND FRED SOLOMON TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/5/2016: DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS JERRY SOLOMON ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; GERALD SOLOMON AND FRED SOLOMON TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/14/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/18/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/1/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DECLARATION OF BRUCE P. NEEDLEMAN RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/18/2016: DECLARATION OF BRUCE P. NEEDLEMAN RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Change of Address

6/26/2018: Notice of Change of Address

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Law Offices of Bruce P. Needleman (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jerry Solomon Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Gerald Solomon (Defendant); Fred Solomon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by USC Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. BREACH OF NOTE, SECURITY AGREEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less