This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:27:15 (UTC).

USATV, LLC VS. LANDMARK INFRASTRUCTURE HOLDING COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 USATV, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LANDMARK INFRASTRUCTURE HOLDING COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4265

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

USATV LLC

GOLDEN EAGLE INSURANCE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC.

LANDMARK INFRASTRUCTURE HOLDING COMPANY

AT&T WIRELESS

AB CELLULAR LA LLC

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS LLC

AT&T MOBILITY

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

MARSH USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LANDMARK INFRASTRUCTURE HOLDING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN LAW GROUP APC

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS P. GMELICH ESQ

BORTON PETRINI LLP

STUART KANE LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by USATV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Mastec North America, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • at 08:31 AM in Department B; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Reply; Filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Mastec North America, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by USATV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by USATV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by USATV, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less