This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 20:47:57 (UTC).

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. VS CARLOS MADRID

Case Summary

On 03/19/2015 USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARLOS MADRID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5222

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC.

ENNEN CORY

ROES 1-250

SIGNAL RESTORATION WEST LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MADRID CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J HARTER APC

Defendant Attorneys

WLA LEGAL SERVICES INC.

ZELIG STEVEN L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department 36; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 36; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by USA Specialized Services, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by USA Specialized Services, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CORY ENNEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ISSSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF DAVID J. HARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF AND SUBMISSION OF SIGNED DECLARATIONS OF CARLSOS MADRID IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Signal Restoration West LLC; DBA : Signal Restoration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELIG STEVEN